Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2314 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/26/2025

                      	HB 2314 
Initials AG/BG 	Page 1 	House Engrossed 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-seventh Legislature 
First Regular Session 
House: HHS DP 12-0-0-0 
 
HB 2314: osteopathic examiners board; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Bliss, LD 1 
House Engrossed 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Board of Osteopathic Examiners in Medicine and Surgery (Board) for 
6 years.  
History 
Established in 1949, the Board regulates the osteopathic profession by issuing and renewing 
licenses, permits and registrations, investigating and resolving complaints and providing 
information to the public about license, permit and registration holders. Its mission is to 
protect the public by setting educational and training standards for licensure, and by 
reviewing complaints made against osteopathic physicians, interns and residents to ensure 
that their conduct meets the standards of the profession, as defined in law (A.R.S. §§ 32-1803 
and 32-1854). 
The Board consists of seven members, two public members and five osteopathic physicians 
all appointed by the Governor to serve five-year terms (A.R.S. § 32-1801). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference (COR) met jointly on January 17, 2025, to conduct a review of the Board. The 
COR recommended the Board be continued for six years.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2031. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2032. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note