Arizona 2025 2025 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1656 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/20/2025

                      	SB 1656 
Initials AG/BG 	Page 1 	Health & Human Services 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-seventh Legislature 
First Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DPA 7-0-0-0 | 3rd Read 22-4-4-0 
 
SB 1656: massage therapy; continuation; study committee 
Sponsor: Senator Dunn, LD 25 
Committee on Health & Human Services 
Overview 
An emergency measure that continues the State Board of Massage Therapy (Board) for 2 
years. Creates a Study Committee on the Continuation of the Arizona Board of Massage 
Therapy (Study Committee) and outlines membership and duties.  
History 
Established in 2003, the Board licenses and regulates massage therapists who specialize in 
the wellness, relaxation, stress reduction, pain relief, postural improvement or therapeutic 
benefits of the public. Its mission is to protect the health, safety and welfare of Arizona 
citizens by regulating and maintaining the standards of the massage therapy profession. The 
Board evaluates the professional competency of massage therapists and promotes continued 
competency and fitness by investigating complaints, holding hearings, monitoring the 
activities of its licensees, providing information to the public and enforcing the standards of 
practice for the massage therapy profession as set forth by law (A.R.S. §§ 32-4203, 32-4254 
and 32-4259).  
The Board consists of five members, three public members and two massage therapists all 
appointed by the Governor (A.R.S. § 32-4202). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference (COR) met jointly on January 17, 2025, to conduct a review of the Board. The 
COR recommended that the Board be consolidated. 
Provisions 
Board of Massage Therapy Continuation Study Committee 
1. Establishes the 12-member Study Committee, consisting of: 
a) three members of the Senate, appointed by the Senate President (President), not more 
than two of whom are members of the same political party, one of whom to serve as 
co-chairperson; 
b) three members of the House of Representatives, appointed by the Speaker of the 
House (Speaker), not more than two of whom are members of the same political party, 
one of whom to serve as co-chairperson; 
c) the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Boards and Commissions or their 
designee; 
d) the Executive Director of the Board or their designee; 
e) a representative of private postsecondary schools who is appointed by the Speaker; 
f) a representative of law enforcement who is appointed by the President; 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☒ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note    	SB 1656 
Initials AG/BG 	Page 2 	Health & Human Services 
g) a representative of a state or national massage therapy association who is appointed 
by the President; and 
h) a representative of a national association of massage therapy licensing boards and 
agencies whose primary interest is public and consumer protection who is appointed 
by the President. (Sec. 3) 
2. Requires the Study Committee to study the Board and make recommendations regarding: 
a) whether the Board should continue in its current form, remain a stand-alone health 
board or be combined with an existing board;  
b) the state's role in expediting background checks; 
c) whether the Board's information technology project that was implemented beginning 
in February 2025 is sufficient to deal with existing issues; and 
d) whether an establishment license should be required in this state as a tool to eliminate 
sex trafficking. (Sec. 3) 
3. Requires the Study Committee to collect: 
a) comparable data points between any previous technology and the new technology 
solution implemented in February 2025; and 
b) feedback from stakeholders, licensed massage therapists throughout Arizona, local 
law enforcement agencies and victims' services advocates to make any recommended 
change to the structure of the Board or to implement any additional licensure types. 
(Sec. 3) 
4. Specifies that Study Committee members are ineligible to receive compensation but are 
eligible for reimbursement of expenses. (Sec. 3) 
5. Requires the Study Committee to produce a report by December 31, 2026, that includes 
the recommendations and submit the report to the President and Speaker. 
6. Requires the Study Committee to submit a copy of the report to the Secretary of State. 
(Sec. 3) 
7. Repeals the Study Committee on July 1, 2027. (Sec. 3) 
Massage Therapy Continuation 
8. Continues, retroactively to July 1, 2025, the Board until July 1, 2027. (Sec. 2, 5) 
9. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2028. (Sec. 2) 
10. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 4) 
11. Contains an emergency clause. (Sec. 6) 
12. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1)