California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1030 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/13/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1030AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 13, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blumenfield FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 14017 to the Government Code, relating to renewable energy projects. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1030, as amended, Blumenfield. Renewable energy projects: Department of Transportation. Existing law provides for the Department of Transportation in the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency, which is administered by the Director of Transportation. Existing law requires the director to perform all duties, exercise all powers and jurisdiction, assume and discharge all responsibilities, and carry out and effect all purposes vested by law in the department, except as otherwise expressly provided by law. This bill would  require   authorize  the Institute of the Environment at the University of California, Los Angeles, in consultation with the director and only upon receipt of funding, to undertake a project for mapping the renewable energy development potential of state-owned real property under the direction and control of the department, as specified. The bill would also require the director to respond within  30   90  days to any proposal to develop a renewable energy project on state-owned real property as to whether the property is available for sale, lease, or encroachment permit, and whether the project would be compatible with the current and projected use of that property. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Solar energy is one of California's most abundant renewable resources that can help reduce demand in the state for electricity during peak consumption periods. (b) Renewable energy promotes economic development and provides opportunities to stimulate the creation of jobs for Californians. (c) Accelerating the use of renewable energy resources wherever feasible, such as open space along transportation corridors, can help to achieve the state's climate change goals required by the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 (Division 25.5 (commencing with Section 38500) of the Health and Safety Code). (d) Aesthetically integrated solar and other renewable energy systems on the more than 150 miles of highway sound walls already built and potentially more associated with new transportation projects are untapped resources that could be put to beneficial uses in generating electricity for neighboring residential areas, reducing energy costs to government, and promoting the installation of additional sound walls for neighborhoods. (e) Unlike most transportation capital outlays that result in increased maintenance costs, investments in renewable energy production and promoting public-private partnerships to use untapped sound walls and other transit property would generate revenues that could be used to offset maintenance costs. (f) Piezoelectric and other renewable energy technology offer increasing opportunities for creative beneficial mixed uses of transportation properties. SEC. 2. Section 14017 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14017. (a) The Institute of the Environment at the University of California, Los Angeles  shall   , may  , in consultation with the director, undertake a project for mapping the renewable energy development potential of state-owned real property under the direction and control of the department. The mapping project shall include, but not be limited to, global positioning mapping to be available for public use that indicates the solar and wind renewable energy potential for state-owned real property owned or controlled by the department. (b) The director shall respond within  30   90  days to any proposal to develop a renewable energy project as to whether the property is available for sale, lease, or encroachment permit, and whether the project would be compatible with the current and projected use of that property. (c) Subdivision (a) shall be implemented only upon receipt of funding by the Institute of the Environment for the project described in that subdivision.