California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1243 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/29/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1243AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonnie Lowenthal FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add and repeal Section 34503.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1243, as amended, Bonnie Lowenthal.  South East Los Angeles County Commercial Vehicle Network Development and Advisory Committee.   Strategic Area Freeway Enforcement Task Force.  Existing law requires the Department of the California Highway Patrol to adopt reasonable rules and regulations that, in the judgment of the department, are designed to promote the safe operation of specified commercial vehicles, regarding, among other things, inspection and maintenance of vehicles and to adopt procedures for the enforcement of these rules and regulations. This bill would, until January 1, 2012, establish the  South East Los Angeles County Commercial Vehicle Network Development and Advisory Committee   Strategic Area Freeway Enforcement Task Force in the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency to develop a work program that will optimize the effectiveness and efficiencies of the commercial vehicle enforcement network in  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County through a multiagency collaborative effort focused on addressing ongoing commercial vehicle enforcement issues and to recognize the potential benefits from specified technologies. The bill would require the  committee   task force  to report annually  ,  on or before December 31 of each year  ,  to the Governor, the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency, and the Assembly Committee on Transportation and the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing on the progress made towards implementation of the recommendations developed to improve commercial vehicle enforcement in  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County pursuant to a specified list of 12 objectives, that include, among other things, review of Vehicle Dimension-in-Motion (VDIM) and Automated Vehicle Identification (AVI) devices as a legal enforcement tool. The bill would require that the  committee  task force  consist of  3   4  specified members, that the members of the committee   task force  serve without compensation, and that no state funds be used to compensate the members for expenses incurred in the performance of their official duties. The bill would also provide that the  committee   task force  would not be required to implement the provisions of the bill except to the extent that nonstate funds are available for that purpose. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 34503.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 34503.5. (a) There is hereby established in the Business,  Transportation and Housing Agency the South East Los Angeles County Commercial Vehicle Network Development and Advisory Committee, which shall be convened on or before April 1, 2010.   Transportation and Housing Agency the Strategic Area Freeway Enforcement Task Force, which shall be convened on or before April 1, 2010.  The goal of the  committee   task force  is to develop a work program that will optimize the effectiveness and efficiencies of the commercial vehicle enforcement network in  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County through a multiagency collaborative effort focused on addressing ongoing commercial vehicle enforcement issues and to recognize the potential benefits from emerging technologies. The activities of the  council   task force  are intended to contribute to maintaining the state's strategic advantage through improved decisionmaking and prudent and adequate investment. (b) The  committee   task force  shall report annually on or before December 31 of each year to the Governor, the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency, and the Assembly Committee on Transportation and the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing on the progress made  towards   toward  implementation of the recommendations developed to improve the commercial vehicle enforcement in  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County pursuant to the objectives set forth in subdivision (f). (c) The  committee   task force  shall consist of  three   four  members. The Secretary of Business, Transportation and Housing shall appoint one member each from nominations provided by the Gateway Cities Council of Governments (COG), the Director of Transportation (Caltrans),  the Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority,  and the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol (CHP). The Secretary of Business, Transportation and Housing shall designate a chair and vice chair. (d) Members of the  committee   task force  shall serve without compensation, and no state funds may be used to compensate the members for expenses incurred in the performance of their official duties. (e) The  committee   task force  shall be responsible for development of a work program and coordinating efforts of the participating agencies in implementation efforts. The  committee   task force  shall from time to time consult stakeholders affected by the work plans as they are developed. The stakeholders should include, at a minimum, representatives from trucking organizations, labor organizations, businesses engaged in commercial vehicle operations, and the San Pedro Bay Ports. (f) The  committee   task force  shall consider the following activities, which address areas to be emphasized, including, but not be limited to, major policy issues related to commercial vehicle enforcement: (1) Evaluate the current commercial vehicle fine structure and the relative distribution of the resulting revenues. (2) Evaluate the potential to standardize fine structure and process. (3) Make recommendations as to whether it is desirable to relate the level of fines to the level of damage to infrastructure and the risk of harm to people. (4) Review current statutory authority for rerouting vehicles. (5) Review role of transponders or other technology devices in relation to registration of commercial vehicles. (6) Review Weigh-in-Motion (WIM) devices as a legal enforcement tool. (7) Review Vehicle Dimension-in-Motion (VDIM) devices as a legal enforcement tool. (8) Review Automated Vehicle Identification (AVI) devices as a legal enforcement tool. (9) Review Automated Driver Identification (ADI) devices as a legal enforcement tool. (10) Review Automated Load Identification (ALI) devices as a legal enforcement tool. (11) Evaluate the siting of truck enforcement facilities in  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County. (12) Evaluate the advantages and disadvantages in the development of automated systems for truck enforcement and inspection for  South East   Southeast  Los Angeles County. (g) The  committee   task force  shall provide a summary of its recommendations regarding all action items to each member agency prior to submitting the annual report required pursuant to subdivision (b). (h) Initial tasks for the  steering committee   task force  shall be the development of a work program that results in the development of a series of specific targeted actions in conformance with each of the following four major action steps to address the areas to be emphasized as specified in subdivision (f): (1) Convening participants. (2) Gathering and analyzing relevant data. (3) Brainstorming of actions. (4) Refinement of actions. (i) The  committee   task force  shall not be required to implement the provisions of this section except to the extent that nonstate funds are available to the  committee   task force  for that purpose. (j) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2012, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2012, deletes or extends that date.