BILL NUMBER: AB 139ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 13, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Brownley (Coauthor: Assembly Member Blumenfield) (Coauthor: Senator Pavley) JANUARY 20, 2009 An act to amend Section 25081 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 139, Brownley. Local government: county boards: regular meetings. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of a county to hold regular meetings of the board at the county seat. This bill would authorize counties to hold one or more regular meetings of the board at a location within the county, if the change of location is adopted by ordinance, resolution, bylaw, or other rule at a regular meeting of the body, and notice of the change in location is posted in a location that is freely accessible to the public no later than the prior regular meeting of the board. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25081 of the Government Code is amended to read: 25081. By ordinance the board shall provide for the holding of regular meetings of the board at the county seat. The board may change the place for the holding of one or more regular meetings of the board to a location within the county other than the county seat if both of the following occur: (a) The change of location of the regular meeting of the board is adopted by ordinance, resolution, bylaw, or other rule required for the conduct of business by the body at a regular meeting of the body. (b) Notice of the location change is posted in a location that is freely accessible to the public no later than the prior regular meeting of the board.