California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1407 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1407INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huffman FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 48315 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1407, as introduced, Huffman. Pupil attendance: interdistrict transfers. Existing law requires each person between the ages of 6 and 18 years of age, who is not otherwise exempt, to attend the public full-time day school in the school district in which his or her parent or guardian is a resident. The governing board of a school district is authorized to accept interdistrict transfers by admitting pupils residing in other school districts to attend its schools, subject to specified conditions. A school district that elects to accept interdistrict transfers is required to keep an accounting of all requests made for alternative attendance and records of all dispositions of those requests and to report this information to the Superintendent of Public Instruction who is required to make this information available to the Governor, the Legislature, and the public on an annual basis. Existing law makes those provisions authorizing a school district to accept interdistrict transfers inoperative on July 1, 2009, and repeals those provisions on January 1, 2010. This bill would extend the inoperative and repeal dates of those provisions to July 1, 2014, and January 1, 2015, respectively. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48315 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48315. This article shall become inoperative on July 1,  2009   2014  , and, as of January 1,  2010   2015  , is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, which becomes effective on or before January 1,  2010   2014  , deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that pupils continue to have the opportunity to apply for interdistrict transfers, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.