California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1435 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/29/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1435AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member V. Manuel Perez  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Ammiano,   Brownley,   Solorio,   and Torlakson   )  FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to  amend Section 52052.5 of   add Section 52052.7 to  the Education Code, relating to public school accountability. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1435, as amended, V. Manuel Perez. Public school accountability. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish an advisory committee to advise on all appropriate matters relative to the creation of the Academic Performance Index and the implementation of the Immediate Intervention/Underperforming Schools Program and the High Achieving/Improving Schools Program. Existing law requires the committee to make recommendations to the Superintendent, by July 1, 2005, on the appropriateness and feasibility of a methodology for generating a measurement of academic performance by using unique pupil identifiers and annual academic achievement growth to provide a more accurate measure of a school's growth over time. This bill would  delete the provisions relating to the recommendations that were required to be submitted by July 1, 2005, and instead  require the advisory committee, by July 1, 2010, to make recommendations to the Superintendent regarding the inclusion of the  California English Language Development Test (CELDT)   results of the English language development test or series of tes   ts developed or acquired pursuant to a specified provision  and the feasibility of including English learner proficiency as part of the Academic Performance Index (API). The bill would require the Superintendent, with the approval of the state board, to include  CELDT   the  results  of the English language development test or series of tests   developed or acquired pursuant to a specified provision  and English language proficiency levels and growth of those levels in the API. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 52052.7 is added to the   Education Code  , to read:   52052.7. By July 1, 2010, the advisory committee established pursuant to Section 52052.5 shall make recommendations to the Superintendent regarding the inclusion of the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to Section 60810 and the feasibility of including English learner proficiency as part of the Academic Performance Index (API). The Superintendent, with the approval of the state board, shall include the results of the English language development test or series of tests developed or acquired pursuant to Section 60810 and English language proficiency levels and growth of those levels in the API.   SECTION 1.   Section 52052.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 52052.5. (a) The Superintendent shall establish a broadly representative and diverse advisory committee to advise the Superintendent and the state board on all appropriate matters relative to the creation of the Academic Performance Index and the implementation of the Immediate Intervention/Underperforming Schools Program and the High Achieving/Improving Schools Program. Members of the advisory committee shall serve without compensation for terms not to exceed two years. The State Department of Education shall provide staff to the advisory panel. (b) By July 1, 2010, the advisory committee established pursuant to this section shall make recommendations to the Superintendent regarding the inclusion of the California English Language Development Test (CELDT) and the feasibility of including English learner proficiency as part of the Academic Performance Index (API). The Superintendent, with the approval of the state board, shall include CELDT results and English language proficiency levels and growth of those levels in the API.