California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1463 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/15/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1463AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Smyth FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section  51413   35183.3  to the Education Code, relating to high school graduation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1463, as amended, Smyth. High school graduation: military uniforms. Existing law prescribes the requirements for a pupil to earn a diploma of graduation from high school, including the completion of a specified course of study and passage of the high school exit examination. This bill would provide that a pupil who has fulfilled all of the requirements to receive a diploma of graduation from high school pursuant to state law  , is otherwise eligible to participate in the high school graduation ceremony,  and has completed the basic training  required  for  ,  and is an active member of  any armed   ,   a  branch of the United States  military   Armed Forces,  has the right to wear the dress uniform issued to him or her by that  military  branch while participating in the graduation ceremony for his or her high school. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section  51413   35183.3  is added to the Education Code, to read:  51413. A high school pupil who has fulfilled all of the requirements to receive a diploma of graduation from high school pursuant to this code and has completed the basic training required for and is an active member of any armed branch of the United States military shall have the right to wear the dress uniform issued to him or her by that military branch while participating in the graduation ceremony for his or her high school.   35183.3.  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a person shall have the right to wear a dress uniform issued to him or her by a branch of the United States Armed Forces while participating in the graduation ceremony for his or her high school if that person meets both of the following requirements: (a) He or she has fulfilled all of the requirements of this code for receiving a diploma of graduation from high school, and is otherwise eligible to participate in the graduation ceremony. (b) He or she has completed basic training for, and is an active member of, a branch of the United States Armed Forces.