California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1482 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/20/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1482AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Anderson FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 144 to the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1482, as amended, Anderson. Department of Water Resources: water softener study. Existing law requires the Department of Water Resources to prepare and update, every 5 years, the California Water Plan, which is the plan for the orderly and coordinated control, protection, conservation, development, and use of the water resources of the state. This bill would require the department  , in consultation with the Pacific Quality Water Association,  to study whether the Legislature should establish a rating system to measure the efficiency levels of self-regenerating water softener systems. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 144 is added to the Water Code, to read: 144. The department  , in consultation with the Pacific Quality Water Association,  shall study whether the Legislature should establish a rating system to measure the efficiency levels of self-regenerating water softener systems, and shall report its findings by January 1, 2012.  The department may fund the study from private sources.