BILL NUMBER: AB 1646AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 21, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hayashi ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Bass, Beall, Buchanan, Coto, Davis, Furutani, Galgiani, Lieu, Ruskin, and Saldana ) ( Coauthor: Senator Strickland ) JANUARY 12, 2010 An act to amend Sections 35179.1 and 49032 of the Education Code, relating to training for high school coaches. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1646, as amended, Hayashi. High school athletics: training for coaches. (1) Existing law states the intent of the Legislature to establish a California High School Coaching Education and Training Program to be administered by local school districts and to emphasize, among other things, training and certification in CPR and first aid. Existing law requires each high school sports coach to complete a coaching education program developed by his or her school district or the California Interscholastic Federation that meets specified guidelines. Existing law makes a high school sports coach responsible for the costs of taking the prescribed course. This bill, commencing December 31, 2011, would require all coaches taking or renewing first aid certification to take training that includes a basic understanding of the signs, symptoms, and appropriate emergency action steps regarding potentially catastrophic injuries, including, but not limited to, head and neck injuries, concussions, 2nd impact syndrome, asthma attacks, heatstroke, and cardiac arrest. By requiring high school coaches to complete this additional training, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. (2) The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 35179.1 of the Education Code is amended to read: 35179.1. (a) This section shall be known and may be cited as the 1998 California High School Coaching Education and Training Program. (b) The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (1) The increase in the number of both boys and girls who participate in high school athletics requires a corresponding increase in the number of coaches statewide. (2) Well-trained coaches are vital to the success of pupil athletes. (3) Hundreds of principals, superintendents, and school board members, who participated in developing a strategic plan in conjunction with the California Interscholastic Federation (CIF), identified coaching improvement as a vital investment. (4) There are many concerns about safety, training, organization, philosophy, communications, and general management in coaching that need to be addressed. (5) School districts, in conjunction with the California Interscholastic Federation, have taken the initial first steps toward building a statewide coaching education program by assembling a faculty of statewide trainers composed of school district administrators, coaches, and athletic directors using a national program being used in several states. (6) Concussions are a serious and growing public health concern, especially for athletes participating in contact sports. (7) Concussions can be difficult to detect and, along with other serious head injuries, can have long-term effects, including suicide, depression, memory loss, sleep disorders, impairments in attention, and motor deficits. The effects of these injuries, while not all preventable, can be mitigated by prompt recognition and appropriate response. (8) The competitive interscholastic athletic culture of playing through pain or "toughing it out" puts pupil athletes at serious risk. (9) Concussions have a cumulative effect. Allowing an athlete to return to play too early after a concussion increases the chance of more serious brain injury. A concussion can cause rapid brain swelling that can result in coma or even death. (10) Currently, coaches, pupil athletes, and parents of pupil athletes lack appropriate awareness about the prevention, identification, and treatment of concussions. (11) According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, at least three million sports- and recreation-related concussions occur in the United States each year. (c) It is, therefore, the intent of the Legislature to establish a California High School Coaching Education and Training Program. It is the intent of the Legislature that the program be administered by local school districts and emphasize the following components: (1) Development of coaching philosophies consistent with the goals of the school, school district, and governing board of the school district. (2) Sport psychology: emphasizing communication, reinforcement of the efforts of young people, effective delivery of coaching regarding technique, and motivation of the pupil athlete. (3) Sport pedagogy: how young athletes learn, and how to teach sport skills. (4) Sport physiology: principles of training, fitness for sport, development of a training program, nutrition for athletes, and the harmful effects associated with the use of steroids and performance-enhancing dietary supplements by adolescents. (5) Sport management: team management, risk management, and working within the context of an entire school program. (6) Training provided by the American Red Cross, the American Heart Association, or another organization that provides equivalent training and certification in all of the following areas: (A) Valid and current certification in CPR. (B) Valid and current certification in first aid that includes a basic understanding of the signs, symptoms, and appropriate emergency action steps regarding potentially catastrophic injuries, including, but not limited to, head and neck injuries, concussions, second impact syndrome, asthma attacks, heatstroke, and cardiac arrest. (C) Emergency action planning. (D) Communicating effectively with 911 emergency services. (7) Knowledge of, and adherence to, statewide rules and regulations, as well as school regulations including, but not necessarily limited to, eligibility, gender equity, and discrimination. (8) Sound planning and goal setting. (d) This section does not endorse a particular coaching education or training program. SEC. 2. Section 49032 of the Education Code is amended to read: 49032. (a) (1) Effective December 31, 2008, each high school sports coach shall have completed a coaching education program developed by his or her school district or the California Interscholastic Federation that meets the guidelines set forth in Section 35179.1. Commencing on December 31, 2011, all coaches taking or renewing their first aid certification shall meet the guidelines set forth in paragraph (6) of subdivision (b) of Section 35179.1, as that section is amended during the second year of the 2009-10 Regular Session. (2) The coaching education program described by paragraph (1) may be taught by an athletic director or high school sports coach who is deemed to be qualified by the California Interscholastic Federation. (b) Upon completion of the coaching education program, a high school sports coach shall be deemed to have completed the education requirement for the remainder of his or her time coaching at the high school level in any school district in the state. (c) Each high school sports coach shall be responsible for the costs of taking thecoursecoaching education program . (d) The training requirements of this section shall count toward the continuing education required for the renewal of the teaching credential of a coach who is also a certificated employee. (e) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a high school sports coach who does not meet the requirements of subdivision (a) may be used for no longer than one season of interscholastic competition. (f) For the purposes of this section, "high school sports coach" means an employee or a volunteer who is authorized by a high school to be responsible for leading a school sports team of pupil athletes. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.