California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1647 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/28/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1647AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Hayashi and Hill (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Bass, Beall,  Buchanan,  Coto, Davis, Fletcher, Furutani, Galgiani, Huffman, Lieu, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ruskin, Saldana, Smyth, and Solorio) (Coauthor: Senator Strickland) JANUARY 13, 2010 An act to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 18898) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code,  and to add Section 33355 to the Education Code, relating to   relating to  athletics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1647, as amended, Hayashi. Athletics.  (1) Existing   Existing  law provides for the regulation of various professions and vocations, including those of an athlete agent. This bill would make it unlawful for any person to hold himself or herself out as  an   a certified  athletic trainer unless he or she has been certified by the Board of Certification, Inc., and has either graduated from a college or university, after completing an accredited athletic training education program, as specified, or completed requirements for certification by the Board of Certification, Inc., prior to January 1, 2004.  The bill would prohibit an athletic trainer from engaging in athletic training activities unless pursuant to protocols developed by a physician and surgeon for that athletic trainer.  The bill would make it an unfair business practice to violate these provisions.  (2) Existing law grants the State Department of Education certain authority over interscholastic athletics, including the authority to state that the policies of school districts, of associations or consortia of school districts, and of the California Interscholastic Federation, concerning interscholastic athletics, are in compliance with both state and federal law.   This bill would require the department to adopt a heat-acclimatization program established by the National Athletic Trainers' Association or other similarly recognized organization, and to post this program on its Internet Web site.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 18898) is added to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, to read: CHAPTER 2.7. ATHLETIC TRAINERS 18898. (a) No person shall hold himself or herself out to be  an   a certified  athletic trainer unless he or she meets the following requirements: (1) He or she has done either of the following: (A) Graduated from a college or university after completing an athletic training education program accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Athletic Training Education, or its predecessors or successors. (B) Completed requirements for certification by the Board of Certification, Inc., prior to January 1, 2004. (2) He or she has been certified by the Board of Certification, Inc.  (b) An athletic trainer shall engage in athletic training activities only pursuant to protocols developed for that athletic trainer by a physician and surgeon licensed by the Medical Board of California or an osteopathic physician and surgeon licensed by the Osteopathic Medical Board of California.   (c)   (b)  It is an unfair business practice within the meaning of Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 17200) of Part 2 of Division 7 for any person to use the title of  "athletic trainer" or  "certified athletic trainer" or any other term, such as "licensed," "registered," or "ATC," that implies or suggests that the person is certified as an athletic trainer, if the person does not meet the requirements of subdivision (a)  and engages in athletic trainer activities pursuant to subdivision (b)  .  SEC. 2.   Section 33355 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33355. The department shall adopt a heat-acclimatization program established by the National Athletic Trainers' Association or other similarly recognized organization and shall post this program on its Internet Web site.