BILL NUMBER: AB 1683ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 5, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres JANUARY 26, 2010 An act to amend Sections 12000 and 12001 of the Education Code, relating to education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1683, Torres. Education: finance. Existing law requires the State Board of Education to direct the allocation and apportionment of federal funds to local school districts and other agencies entitled to receive those funds. This bill would define school districts for purposes of these provisions to include county offices of education, charter schools, and other agencies deemed eligible pursuant to state and federal law. The bill would also make technical changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12000 of the Education Code is amended to read: 12000. (a) If, by any act of Congress, funds are provided as federal aid to education to the several states and the disposition of the funds is not otherwise provided for by or under the act of Congress or by or under any law of this state, the apportionment and distribution of those funds to school districts shall, insofar as consistent with the requirements prescribed by the federal law and implementing rules and regulations, be governed by the standards set forth in this article. (b) If a federal law designates a state educational agency or other agency or officer primarily responsible for state supervision of public schools, that designation shall be deemed to refer to the State Board of Education. The State Board of Education shall make timely application for any federal funds made available, and shall, pursuant to the federal law and this article, direct the allocation and apportionment of the federal funds to school districts. (c) As used in this article, "school districts" include school districts, county offices of education, charter schools, and other agencies deemed eligible pursuant to state and federal law. SEC. 2. Section 12001 of the Education Code is amended to read: 12001. The State Board of Education shall adopt rules and regulations for the allocation of federal funds to school districts entitled to receive federal funds for the support of schools. In determining the rules and regulations by which those allocations are to be made, the State Board of Education shall consider all factors of local effort and all educational programs maintained by those school districts. The rules and regulations adopted pursuant to this section shall be based upon need, and the State Board of Education shall carefully scrutinize the abilities and efforts of the affected school districts.