California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB170 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/23/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 170ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 22, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza JANUARY 29, 2009 An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 273 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to court reporters. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 170, Mendoza. Court reporters: rough draft transcript. Existing law provides that the report of the official reporter or official reporter pro tempore of any court, as specified, when transcribed and certified as being a correct transcript of the testimony and proceedings in a case, is prima facie evidence of that testimony and proceedings. Existing law specifically provides that the report, when prepared as a rough draft transcript, shall not be certified and cannot be used, cited, or transcribed as the official certified transcript of the proceedings. Existing law also provides that the rough draft transcript may not be cited or used to rebut or contradict the official certified transcript and that the production of a rough draft transcript shall not be required. This bill would provide, until January 1, 2017, that the instant visual display of the testimony or proceedings, or both, shall not be certified and cannot be used, cited, distributed, or transcribed as the official certified transcript of the proceedings. The bill also would prohibit the citation or use of the instant visual display of the testimony or proceedings, or both, to rebut or contradict the official certified transcript of the proceedings. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 273 of the Code of Civil Procedure is amended to read: 273. (a) The report of the official reporter, or official reporter pro tempore, of any court, duly appointed and sworn, when transcribed and certified as being a correct transcript of the testimony and proceedings in the case, is prima facie evidence of that testimony and proceedings. (b) The report of the official reporter, or official reporter pro tempore, of any court, duly appointed and sworn, when prepared as a rough draft transcript, shall not be certified and cannot be used, cited, distributed, or transcribed as the official certified transcript of the proceedings. A rough draft transcript shall not be cited or used in any way or at any time to rebut or contradict the official certified transcript of the proceedings as provided by the official reporter or official reporter pro tempore. The production of a rough draft transcript shall not be required. (c) The instant visual display of the testimony or proceedings, or both, shall not be certified and cannot be used, cited, distributed, or transcribed as the official certified transcript of the proceedings. The instant visual display of the testimony or proceedings, or both, shall not be cited or used in any way or at any time to rebut or contradict the official certified transcript of the proceedings as provided by the official reporter or official reporter pro tempore. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 273 is added to the Code of Civil Procedure, to read: 273. (a) The report of the official reporter, or official reporter pro tempore, of any court, duly appointed and sworn, when transcribed and certified as being a correct transcript of the testimony and proceedings in the case, is prima facie evidence of that testimony and proceedings. (b) The report of the official reporter, or official reporter pro tempore, of any court, duly appointed and sworn, when prepared as a rough draft transcript, shall not be certified and cannot be used, cited, distributed, or transcribed as the official certified transcript of the proceedings. A rough draft transcript shall not be cited or used in any way or at any time to rebut or contradict the official certified transcript of the proceedings as provided by the official reporter or official reporter pro tempore. The production of a rough draft transcript shall not be required. (c) This section shall become operative on January 1, 2017.