BILL NUMBER: AB 1745AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 10, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ammiano FEBRUARY 8, 2010 An act to repeal and add Section 103692 amend Sect ion 103680 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1745, as amended, Ammiano. Vital records: fees: disposition of human remains. Under existing law, the local registrar of births and deaths is required to collect various fees for an application for the disposition of human remains. Existing law requires, as part of those fees, after January 1, 2005, $4 to be paid to the State Registrar to implement and maintain the electronic death registration system, as specified that $3 be paid to the local registrar of births and deaths by the applicant for the permit to be used for the training of peace officer members of county coroners' offices and for indigent burial . This bill would allow the local registrar of births and deaths to charge an additional fee of up to $8 to fund the disposition of the remains of indigent residents of the county. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 103680 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 103680. (a) Effective January 1, 1991, an additional fee of three dollars ($3) for issuance of a permit for disposition of human remains pursuant to Section 103675 shall be payable to the local registrar of births and deaths by the applicant for the permit. This amount shall be exempt from any adjustment made pursuant to Section 100430. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the local registrar of births and deaths shall pay into the Peace Officers' Training Fund, by the 10th of the month following the end of each calendar quarter one dollar ($1) of the fee collected pursuant to subdivision (a) for the training of peace officer members of county coroners' offices. The remaining funds collected pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be paid into the county treasury to be expended for indigent burial. (c) (1) In addition to the fee collected pursuant to subdivision (a), the local registrar of a county may charge an applicant for a permit for the disposition of human remains a fee in an amount not to exceed eight dollars ($8) to be paid into the county treasury and to be expended for the disposition of the remains of indigent residents of that county. (2) The fees collected pursuant to this subdivision shall be exempt from adjustment pursuant to Section 100430. SECTION 1. Section 103692 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 103692 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 103692. (a) In addition to the fees prescribed by Section 103065 and by Sections 103675 to 103685, inclusive, an applicant for a permit for the disposition of human remains shall pay a fee of four dollars ($4), to be paid to the local registrar of births and deaths who shall transfer the moneys to the State Registrar for use, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to implement and maintain the electronic death registration system required by Section 102778. (b) In addition to the fee assessed pursuant to subdivision (a), the local registrar of a county may charge an applicant for a permit for the disposition of human remains a fee in an amount not to exceed eight dollars ($8) to fund the disposition of the remains of indigent residents of that county. (c) The fees imposed by this section shall be exempt from adjustment pursuant to Section 100430.