BILL NUMBER: AB 1745ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 10, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ammiano FEBRUARY 8, 2010 An act to amend Section 103680 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1745, Ammiano. Vital records: fees: disposition of human remains. Under existing law, the local registrar of births and deaths is required to collect various fees for an application for the disposition of human remains. Existing law requires, as part of those fees, that $3 be paid to the local registrar of births and deaths by the applicant for the permit to be used for the training of peace officer members of county coroners' offices and for indigent burial. This bill would allow the local registrar of births and deaths to charge an additional fee of up to $8 to fund the disposition of the remains of indigent residents of the county. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 103680 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 103680. (a) Effective January 1, 1991, an additional fee of three dollars ($3) for issuance of a permit for disposition of human remains pursuant to Section 103675 shall be payable to the local registrar of births and deaths by the applicant for the permit. This amount shall be exempt from any adjustment made pursuant to Section 100430. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the local registrar of births and deaths shall pay into the Peace Officers' Training Fund, by the 10th of the month following the end of each calendar quarter one dollar ($1) of the fee collected pursuant to subdivision (a) for the training of peace officer members of county coroners' offices. The remaining funds collected pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be paid into the county treasury to be expended for indigent burial. (c) (1) In addition to the fee collected pursuant to subdivision (a), the local registrar of a county may charge an applicant for a permit for the disposition of human remains a fee in an amount not to exceed eight dollars ($8) to be paid into the county treasury and to be expended for the disposition of the remains of indigent residents of that county. (2) The fees collected pursuant to this subdivision shall be exempt from adjustment pursuant to Section 100430.