California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1778 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/30/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1778ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lieu FEBRUARY 9, 2010 An act to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 6096) to Division 7 of the Government Code, relating to state promotions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1778, Lieu. State agency promotions: commercials. Existing law establishes the California Tourism Marketing Act as a means of funding generic promotion of this state as a tourism destination. This bill would require any department, commission, office, agency, or other administrative entity of the state that produces, or contracts for the production of, a promotional commercial for the state or a product of the state, and finances that commercial in whole or in part with public funds, to film that commercial in this state. The bill would except from its provisions agreements to feature or promote California products in a program made by a private entity, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 6096) is added to Division 7 of the Government Code, to read: CHAPTER 1.7. OFFICIAL PROMOTIONAL COMMERCIALS 6096. (a) Any department, commission, office, agency, or other administrative entity of the state that produces, or contracts for the production of, a promotional commercial for the state or a product of the state, and finances that commercial in whole or in part with public funds, shall require that commercial to be filmed in this state. (b) This section does not apply to an agreement between a state entity and a private entity to feature or otherwise promote a California product in a program that is made by a private entity and featuring or promoting the product is not the primary purpose of the program.