California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1779 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1779INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Niello FEBRUARY 9, 2010 An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1779, as introduced, Niello. Taxation: cancellation of indebtedness: mortgage debt forgiveness. (1) The Personal Income Tax Law conforms to specified provisions of the federal Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Act of 2007, relating to the exclusion of the discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness, as defined, from a taxpayer's income if that debt is discharged after January 1, 2007, and before January 1, 2010, as provided. The Emergency Economic Stabilization Act of 2008 extended the operation of those provisions to debt that is discharged before January 1, 2013. This bill would provide further conformity to those federal acts, as provided. (2) This bill would take effect immediately as a tax levy. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 17144.5. (a) Section 108 of the Internal Revenue Code, relating to income from discharge of indebtedness, as amended by Section 2 of the Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Act of 2007 (Public Law 110-142),  and as amended by Section 303 of the Emergency Economic Stabilization Act of 2008 (Public Law 110-343),  shall apply, except as otherwise provided.  (b) Section 108(a)(1)(E) of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by Section 2 of the Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Act of 2007 (Public Law 110-142), is modified by substituting the phrase "January 1, 2009" for "January 1, 2010" contained therein.   (c) Section 108(a)(1)(E) of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by Section 2 of the Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Act of 2007 (Public Law 110-142), is additionally modified to provide that the amount excluded from gross income shall not exceed $250,000 ($125,000 in the case of a married individual filing a separate return).   (d) Section 108(h)(2) of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by Section 2 of the Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Act of 2007 (Public Law 110-142), is modified by substituting the phrase "(within the meaning of section 163(h)(3)(B), applied by substituting '$800,000 ($400,000' for '$1,000,000 ($500,000' in clause (ii) thereof)" for the phrase "(within the meaning of section 163(h)(3)(B), applied by substituting '$2,000,000 ($1,000,000' for '$1,000,000 ($500,000' in clause (ii) thereof)" contained therein.   (e)   (b)  This section shall apply to discharges of indebtedness occurring on or after January 1, 2007, and, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, no penalties or interest shall be due with respect to the discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness during the 2007 taxable year regardless of whether or not the taxpayer reports the discharge on his or her return for the 2007 taxable year. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that the mortgage debt tax relief allowed to taxpayers in connection with the discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness, as described in this act, serves a public purpose and does not constitute a gift of public funds within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XVI of the California Constitution. SEC. 3. This act provides for a tax levy within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect.