California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB179 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/29/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 179AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Portantino  (   Principal coauthor:   Assembly Member   Caballero   )   (   Principal coauthor:   Senator   Negrete McLeod   )  FEBRUARY 2, 2009  An act to add Section 290.024 to the Penal Code, relating to sex offender registration.   An act relating to taxation.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 179, as amended, Portantino.  Sex offender registration: e-mail addresses.   Income and corporation taxes: report.   The Franchise Tax Board, among other things, administers the Personal Income Tax Law and the Corporation Tax Law.   This bill would require the board to report to the Legislature specified information relating to corporations, entities, or individuals receiving tax exemptions, deductions, credits, and credit carryovers, as provided.   Existing law requires a person convicted of any specified sex offenses to register as a sex offender and provide specified information to law enforcement agencies. That information is kept at the location where the offender registered and transmitted to the Department of Justice where it is electronically stored in the Violent Crime Information Network (VCIN), as specified.   This bill would provide that, beginning January 1, 2011, the Department of Justice shall study the feasibility and value of requiring every person who must register as a sex offender to include in the information provided by the person all e-mail addresses and instant message addresses he or she uses, or intends to use, to communicate over the Internet. This bill would require the department' s study to include a determination of the value and feasibility of incorporating this information in the VCIN.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   (a) The Franchise Tax Board shall report to the Legislature the names of any corporation, entity, or individual that receives any exemption, deduction, credit, credit adjustment, or credit carryover under the Personal Income Tax Law or the Corporation Tax Law, or both, that results in a reduction of tax liability of one million dollars ($1,000,000) or more. The report shall include all of the following:   (1) The name of the corporation, individual, or entity.   (2) The specific exemption, deduction, credit, credit adjustment, or credit carryover that results in a one million dollar ($1,000,000) or more reduction of tax liability.   (3) The amount of reduction in tax liability for each category specified in paragraph (2).   (b) The report shall be a public document and shall be made available by publication and on the Internet.   SECTION 1.   Section 290.024 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 290.024. Beginning January 1, 2011, the Department of Justice shall study the feasibility and value of requiring every person who must register pursuant to Section 290 to include in the information provided by the person all e-mail addresses and instant message addresses he or she uses, or intends to use, to communicate over the Internet. The Department of Justice study shall include a determination of the value and feasibility of incorporating this information in the Violent Crime Information Network (VCIN).