California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1800 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/15/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1800AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 16, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ma and Hagman FEBRUARY 10, 2010 An act to amend Section 602.9 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1800, as amended, Ma. Unlawful rental of residential dwelling: penalties. Existing law makes it a misdemeanor, punishable as specified, for any person to claim ownership or claim or take possession of, or cause another to enter or remain in, a residential dwelling for the purpose of renting or leasing the dwelling to another without the consent of the owner or the owner's lawful agent. This bill would increase the misdemeanor penalties for this offense, as specified. Because this bill would change the penalty for a crime, it would create a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 602.9 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 602.9. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (c), any person who, without the owner's or owner's agent's consent, claims ownership or claims or takes possession of a residential dwelling for the purpose of renting that dwelling to another is guilty of a misdemeanor punishable by imprisonment in a county jail not exceeding one year, or by a fine not exceeding two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500), or by both that imprisonment and fine. Each violation is a separate offense. (b) Except as provided in subdivision (c), any person who, without the owner's or owner's agent's consent, causes another person to enter or remain in any residential dwelling for the purpose of renting that dwelling to another, is guilty of a misdemeanor punishable by imprisonment in a county jail not exceeding one year, or by a fine not exceeding two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500), or by both that imprisonment and fine. Each violation is a separate offense. (c) This section does not apply to any tenant, subtenant, lessee, sublessee, or assignee, nor to any other hirer having a lawful occupancy interest in the residential dwelling. (d) Nothing in this section shall preclude the prosecution of a person under any other applicable provision of law. (e) It is the intent of the Legislature that this section shall not  preclude, and has never precluded,   preclude  the prosecution of a person on grand theft or fraud charges.  The Legislature finds that this section has never precluded prosecution of a person on grand theft or fraud charges.  SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.