BILL NUMBER: AB 184ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block (Coauthor: Assembly Member Fuentes) (Coauthors: Senators Ducheny and Padilla) FEBRUARY 2, 2009 An act to amend and repeal Section 56836.155 of the Education Code, relating to special education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 184, Block. Special education funding. Existing law adjusts funding for individuals with exceptional needs based on an incidence multiplier, as defined, for each special education local plan area. This bill would continue the current special education incidence factor formula through the 2010-11 fiscal year. The bill would make the adjustment inoperative on July 1, 2011, and repeal it on January 1, 2012. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 56836.155 of the Education Code is amended to read: 56836.155. (a) On or before November 2, 1998, the department, in conjunction with the Legislative Analyst's Office, shall do the following: (1) Calculate an "incidence multiplier" for each special education local plan area using the definition, methodology, and data provided in the final report submitted by the American Institutes for Research pursuant to Section 67 of Chapter 854 of the Statutes of 1997. (2) Submit the incidence multiplier for each special education local plan area and supporting data to the Department of Finance. (b) The Department of Finance shall review the incidence multiplier for each special education local plan area and the supporting data, and report any errors to the department and the Legislative Analyst's Office for correction. (c) The Department of Finance shall approve the final incidence multiplier for each special education local plan area by November 23, 1998. (d) For the 1998-99 fiscal year and each fiscal year thereafter to and including the 2010-11 fiscal year, the Superintendent shall perform the following calculation to determine the adjusted entitlement of each special education local plan area for the incidence of disabilities: (1) The incidence multiplier for the special education local plan area shall be multiplied by the statewide target amount per unit of average daily attendance for special education local plan areas determined pursuant to Section 56836.11 for the fiscal year in which the computation is made. (2) The amount determined pursuant to paragraph (1) shall be added to the statewide target amount per unit of average daily attendance for special education local plan area determined pursuant to Section 56836.11 for the fiscal year in which the computation is made. (3) Subtract the amount of funding for the special education local plan area determined pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) or paragraph (1) of subdivision (b) of Section 56836.08, as appropriate for the fiscal year in which the computation is made, or the statewide target amount per unit of average daily attendance for special education local plan areas determined pursuant to Section 56836.11 for the fiscal year in which the computation is made, whichever is greater, from the amount determined pursuant to paragraph (2). For the purposes of this paragraph for the 2002-03, 2003-04, 2004-05, 2005-06, 2006-07, 2007-08, 2008-09, 2009-10, and 2010-11 fiscal years, the amount, if any, received pursuant to Section 56836.159 shall be excluded from the funding level per unit of average daily attendance for a special education local plan area. If the result is less than zero, the special education local plan area shall not receive an adjusted entitlement for the incidence of disabilities. (4) Multiply the amount determined in paragraph (3) by either the average daily attendance reported for the special education local plan area for the fiscal year in which the computation is made, as adjusted pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 56836.15, or the average daily attendance reported for the special education local plan area for the prior fiscal year, as adjusted pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 56826.15, whichever is less. (5) If there are insufficient funds appropriated in the fiscal year for which the computation is made for the purposes of this section, the amount received by each special education local plan area shall be prorated. (e) For the 1997-98 fiscal year, the Superintendent shall perform the calculation in paragraphs (1) to (3), inclusive, of paragraph (d) only for the purposes of making the computation in paragraph (1) of subdivision (d) of Section 56836.08, but the special education local plan area shall not receive an adjusted entitlement for the incidence of disabilities pursuant to this section for the 1997-98 fiscal year. (f) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2011, and, as of January 1, 2012, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2012, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: Unless an entitlement is provided for the 2009-10 school year, school districts will face financial hardship if they are required to return funds to the department that were distributed to them in error; therefore it is necessary that this act go into immediate effect.