California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1878 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/05/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1878AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lieu FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act  to add and repeal Section 14776 of the Government Code,  relating to state government forms. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1878, as amended, Lieu. Statewide Forms Management Program. Existing law requires the Director of General Services to establish and staff an activity within the department, known as the "forms management center," for the orderly design, implementation, and maintenance of a statewide forms management program. Existing law requires the director to provide notice to state agencies, forms management representatives, and departmental forms coordinators, that appropriate references to state-registered domestic partner, parent, or state-registered domestic partnership are to be included in revising all public-use forms, as specified.   This bill, until January 1, 2013, would require the Department of General Services to conduct a study of the forms in current use, as identified by the forms management program, for the purpose of identifying forms that should include voluntary questions to demographic data relating to sexual orientation and gender identity for the purpose of developing effective policy. The bill would require the results of the study to be submitted, as specified, to the Legislature no later than January 1, 2012.   This bill would declare the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would incorporate into the Statewide Forms Management Program voluntary demographic questions and information relating to sexual orientation, gender identity, and domestic partnership status.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 14776 is added to the   Government Code   , to read:   14776. (a) The department shall conduct a study of the forms in current use, as identified by the forms management program, for the purpose of identifying forms that should include voluntary questions to demographic data relating to sexual orientation and gender identity for the purpose of developing effective policy. The results of the study shall be reported to the Legislature no later than January 1, 2012. The report shall be submitted as provided in Section 9795. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2013, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2013, deletes or extends that date.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would incorporate into the Statewide Forms Management Program voluntary demographic questions and information relating to sexual orientation, gender identity, and domestic partnership status.