California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1890 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1890CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 199 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 27, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 5, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Higher Education (Portantino (Chair), Block, Cook, Fong, Galgiani, Huber, Ma, and Ruskin) FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to amend Section 2080.8 of, and to repeal Section 2080.9 of, the Civil Code, relating to property. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1890, Committee on Higher Education. Property: lost and unclaimed. Existing law authorizes the Regents of the University of California to provide by resolution or regulation for the care, restitution, sale, or destruction of unclaimed property in the possession of the regents or of the University of California Police Department. Existing law also authorizes the Trustees of the California State University to provide by resolution or regulation for the care, restitution, sale, or destruction of unclaimed, lost, or abandoned property in the possession of any state university. Existing law requires any resolution or regulation adopted by the trustees pursuant to those provisions to include that property shall be held for a period of at least 6 months. This bill would limit that requirement to property valued at or above $300. The bill would extend the authorization of the Regents of the University of California to also provide for the care, restitution, sale, or destruction of lost or abandoned property, as specified. The bill would also decrease the minimum holding period to 3 months for property held by the state university. The bill would make related technical, nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2080.8 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 2080.8. (a) The Regents of the University of California and the Trustees of the California State University, as applicable, may provide by resolution or regulation for the care, restitution, sale, or destruction of unclaimed, lost, or abandoned property in the possession of the Regents of the University of California, the University of California Police Department, or any state university. (b) Any resolution or regulation adopted pursuant to this section shall provide therein (1) that unclaimed, lost, or abandoned property valued at or above three hundred dollars ($300) shall be held by the Regents of the University of California, the University of California Police Department, or the particular state university for a period of at least three months, (2) that thereafter the property will be sold at public auction to the highest bidder, and (3) that notice of that sale shall be given by the Regents of the University of California, the University of California Police Department, or the Trustees of the California State University at least five days before the time therefor by publication once in a newspaper of general circulation published in the county in which the property is held. (c) The Regents of the University of California or the Trustees of the California State University may dispose of any of that property upon which no bid is made at any sale. SEC. 2. Section 2080.9 of the Civil Code is repealed.