California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1914 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/26/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1914AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to add Section 18914.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1914, as amended, Davis. Public social services: food stamp benefits. Existing law provides for the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), under which food stamps are allocated to the state by the federal government and are distributed to eligible households by each county.  Existing law requires, to the extent provided by federal law, that food stamp benefits be provided on an expedited basis to households determined to be in immediate need of food assistance.  Existing law provides for the payment of unemployment compensation benefits to eligible individuals who are unemployed through no fault of their own. This bill would require a county to take into consideration unemployment compensation benefits of an applicant or recipient of food stamp benefits for the purposes of determining eligibility and the benefit amount only if the county obtains a specified report from the Employment Development Department containing specified information relating to that applicant's unemployment compensation benefits. The bill would also require the county to provide a copy of the report to the applicant or recipient if the county takes any action based on the information in the report. To the extent that it would increase the duties of counties in administering the SNAP program, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18914.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 18914.1. A county shall take into consideration any unemployment compensation benefit income of an applicant or recipient under this chapter for the purposes of determining eligibility and the amount of benefits only if the county obtains a written  or electronic  report from the Employment Development Department pursuant to Section 10606.1 showing the exact amount of the unemployment compensation benefits and the date that the applicant or recipient will receive the unemployment compensation benefits. The county shall provide the applicant or recipient with a copy of the report obtained from the department pursuant to Section 10606.1 if the county takes any action based on the information in the report. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.