California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1920 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1920AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to add  Section 16168 to   and repeal Section 160   15 of  the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster youth. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1920, as amended, Davis. Foster youth: personal information: pilot program. Existing law  establishes the Office of the State Foster Care Ombudsperson in the State Department of Social Services with prescribed powers and duties relating to the management of foster children, including the dissemination of information on the rights of children and youth in foster care   provides for the out-of-home placement of children who are unable to remain in the custody and care of their parent or parents, including providing for a range of child welfare and foster care services, at the state and local levels. Existing law identifies the case plan as the foundation and central unifying tool in child welfare services, and requires various categories of information to be incorporated into a child's case plan  . This bill would require the  office   State Department of Social Services  to take all necessary steps to establish and implement an Internet Web-based foster care document storage pilot program and authorize the counties of Los Angeles, San Francisco, and San Bernardino to participate in this pilot program in accordance with the bill. The bill would provide that the pilot program would consist of an interactive, secured Internet Web site designed to give foster youth and  their care providers   former foster yout   h from 15 to 21 years of age, inclusive,  access to designated personal information of the foster youth. The bill would require the  office   department  to ensure that the Internet Web site maintains the confidentiality of medical and other records on the Internet Web site, consistent with applicable state and federal law. This bill would  require participating counties to report to the Legislature, on or before October 1, 2014, on the effectiveness of the pilot program, as specified. It would  authorize the funding of the pilot program through private, public, or nonprofit funding sources.  This bill would provide for the repeal of its provisions on January 1, 2016.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 16168 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 16168. (a) The Office of the State Foster Care Ombudsperson   SECTION 1.   Section 16015 is added to the   Welfare and Institutions Code   , to read:   16015.   (a)     The State Departmen   t of Social Services  shall take all necessary steps, including consulting with all appropriate state  departments   departments and foster youth advocates, including, but not limited to, California Youth Connection, the County Welfare Directors Association of   California (CWDA), and Living Advantage, Inc.  , to establish and implement an Internet Web-based foster care document storage pilot program, and authorize the counties of Los Angeles, San Francisco, and San Bernardino to participate in this pilot program in accordance with this section. (b) The pilot program established pursuant to this section shall consist of an interactive, secured, Internet Web site, designed to give foster youth and  their care providers   former foster youth from 15 to 21 years of age, inclusive,  access to the foster youth's personal information, as described in subdivision (c). (c) The information maintained on the Internet Web site shall include, but shall not be limited to, all of the following: (1) Birth records. (2) Social security numbers. (3) Immunization and other medical records. (4) School records. (5) Official identification cards. (6) Resumes. (d) The Internet Web site shall allow a foster child to develop a personal database to store important telephone numbers and addresses. (e) The Internet Web site shall also provide information and links to connect foster youth to appropriate resources to meet their educational needs, independent living skills requirements, and work needs. (f) The  office   department  shall ensure that the Internet Web site maintains the confidentiality of medical and other records on the Internet Web site, consistent with the requirements of this section and applicable state and federal law.  (g) (1) Each participating county shall prepare a report, which shall be submitted to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature on or before October 1, 2014, on the effectiveness of the pilot program in improving access to vital documents and any problems associated with ensuring the safety of private or confidential information of the foster youth participating in the pilot program.   (2) A report required by this subdivision shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.   (g)   (h) The pilot program established under this section may be funded through private, public, or nonprofit funding sources.  (i) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.