California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1922 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1922INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to add Section 51204.8 to, and to add Chapter 3.9 (commencing with Section 8680) to Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, relating to civil rights education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1922, as introduced, Davis. Civil rights education: California Civil Rights Education Commission. Existing law establishes the system of public elementary and secondary schools in this state. Existing law establishes courses of study to be pursued by elementary and secondary school pupils. The State Department of Education is required to incorporate, into publications that provide examples of curriculum resources for teacher use, those materials that are age-appropriate and consistent with subject frameworks on history and social science that deal with civil rights, human rights violations, genocide, slavery, and the Holocaust. This bill would establish the 15-member California Civil Rights Commission in state government. The bill would require the commission to provide information and coordination and facilitation services with respect to courses and programs that relate to the civil rights movement, and to provide assistance to education officials and community organizations. The bill would specify the procedure for the appointment of the members of the commission. The bill would provide that members of the commission would receive no compensation for their services, but would be reimbursed for the expenses they incur while performing their duties. The commission would be authorized to hire employees and enter into contracts for goods and services. The commission would also be authorized to apply for, and receive, gifts and grants from public and private sources. The bill would require the State Board of Education to make civil rights education a mandatory part of instruction in the public elementary and secondary schools, and to work with the California Civil Rights Commission in implementing prescribed guidelines. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares both of the following: (a) Understanding the important role of the Civil Rights Movement in the lives of African Americans and all other Americans, and understanding the importance of teaching California's children all of our history, it is the goal of the Legislature to provide meaningful support to this most important endeavor. (b) California's role in the struggle for civil rights also needs to be formalized and taught as a beacon of hope for all Californians. SEC. 2. Chapter 3.9 (commencing with Section 8680) is added to Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, to read: CHAPTER 3.9. CALIFORNIA CIVIL RIGHTS EDUCATION COMMISSION 8680. (a) The California Civil Rights Education Commission is hereby established in state government. The commission shall be assigned to the office of the Secretary of State for administrative purposes only. (b) The commission shall provide, or assist education officials and community organizations with providing, information and coordination and facilitation services, with respect to courses or programs that relate to the civil rights movement. In completing these tasks, the commission may act as a liaison with various entities, including, but not necessarily limited to, the United States Congress, the California Legislature, the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, as well as other national and international agencies. 8681. (a) (1) The commission shall consist of 15 members, 11 of whom shall serve terms, commencing and ending on July 1 of the appropriate years, on a rotating basis. Of the 11 initial members of the commission who serve terms, three shall serve terms ending on July 1, 2012, four shall serve terms ending on July 1, 2013, and four shall serve terms ending on July 1, 2014. Members of the commission appointed to succeed the members referenced above, other than those appointed to fill the unexpired portion of a term, shall all serve three-year terms. No member may serve more than two terms. (2) The 11 members serving terms shall be chosen from applicants who apply to a four-member joint committee consisting of representatives of the California State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges. The joint committee shall make its initial 11 appointments by July 1, 2011. The members of the joint committee shall also be members of the commission. (3) The members of the joint committee shall be appointed as follows: (A) The representative of the California State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People shall be appointed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction from a list of up to two names submitted by the conference to the Superintendent of Public Instruction. (B) The representative of the University of California shall be appointed by the President of the University of California. (C) The representative of the California State University shall be appointed by the Chancellor of the California State University. (D) The representative of the California Community Colleges shall be appointed by the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges. (b) The members of the commission shall be California residents, and shall be appointed with due regard for broad geographic representation. (c) The commission shall have a chairperson, who shall be designated from the membership of the commission by the Superintendent of Public Instruction to serve in that capacity for the remainder of his or her term. (d) Eight members of the commission shall constitute a quorum for the transaction of the business of the commission. Members of the commission shall receive no compensation for the performance of their duties, but shall be reimbursed for the expenses they incur in performing these duties. (e) The commission shall adopt rules and regulations, and set standards and policies, for the organization, operation, management, budgeting, and programs of the commission. The commission is authorized to hire employees and enter into contracts for goods and services. 8682. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the commission may apply for, and receive, gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private sources, including, but not necessarily limited to, federal funds and private foundation grants. SEC. 3. Section 51204.8 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51204.8. The state board shall make civil rights education a mandatory part of the curriculum in public elementary and secondary schools. The state board shall work with the California Civil Rights Education Commission established pursuant to Chapter 3.9 (commencing with Section 8680) of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 in implementing all of the following guidelines: (a) Providing assistance and advice to public elementary and secondary schools with respect to civil rights movement education and awareness programs. (b) Surveying and cataloging the extent to which civil rights education exists in statewide curricula. (c) Creating an inventory of civil rights memorials, exhibits, and resources that could be used in classrooms and for other educational programs. (d) Compiling a list of volunteers who are willing to share their knowledge and experiences concerning the struggle for civil rights. (e) Preparing reports for the Governor and the Legislature on the inclusion of civil rights studies into the educational systems of the state.