California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1931 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1931AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torrico  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Coto,   Davis,  Fletcher,   and Jones   )   (   Coauthors:   Senators   Florez   and Wolk   )  FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend  Section 104339.6 of   Sections 104336, 104337, and 104339.6 of, and to repeal Section 104339.5 of,  the Health and Safety Code, relating to injury prevention, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1931, as amended, Torrico. Injury prevention. Existing law, the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999, establishes the Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund, continuously appropriated to the University of California, for the purpose of awarding grants to perform spinal cord injury research projects.  The fund consists of moneys from private entities, as specified, as well as public moneys transferred to the fund.  Existing law, with the approval of the Regents of the University of California, also creates a Spinal Cord Injury Research Program in the University of California to promote spinal cord injury research in California. The program and the fund are repealed as of January 1, 2011. This bill would  require the fund to   consist only   of moneys from private entities, would   expressly   provide that these moneys may be expended sole   l   y for research programs and grants, as specified, and would  delay the repeal date of the Spinal Cord Research Program and the fund to January 1, 2016. By extending the repeal date of a continuously appropriated fund this bill would make an appropriation. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 104336 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended to read:  104336. (a) There is hereby established a Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund. Notwithstanding Section 13340 of the Government Code, the fund is continuously appropriated to the University of California for the purposes of this chapter. (b) The fund shall consist of money accepted by the University of California from grants and donations from private entities  as well as public moneys transferred to the fund  .  Any public moneys transferred to the fund prior to January 1, 2011, shall remain available in the fund for expenditures pursuant to this chapter.  (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, money remaining in the fund at the end of a fiscal year shall not revert to the General Fund.  SEC. 2.   Section 104337 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended to read:  104337.  The   Moneys in the  fund established pursuant to Section 104336 may be expended by the University of California  solely  for  the award of grants to perform  spinal cord injury research  projects   programs and grants, and may be expended for, but not limited to, costs for peer review and grant administration  .  SEC. 3.   Section 1043   39.5 of the   Health and Safety Code   is repealed.   104339.5. This chapter shall be implemented only to the extent that funding for its purposes is appropriated to the Regents of the University of California in the annual Budget Act or another statute.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 4.  Section 104339.6 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 104339.6. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.