BILL NUMBER: AB 2001ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 5, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Harkey FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to add Section 18949.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2001, Harkey. Building standards: State Department of Public Health: regulations. Under existing law, the California Building Standards Law, the California Building Standards Commission is required to approve any building standard proposed by other agencies, as specified. Existing law transfers the responsibilities of certain agencies to adopt regulations relating to building standards to the commission. This bill would, except as specified, transfer the responsibilities of the State Department of Public Health to adopt regulations relating to building standards to the commission. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18949.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 18949.7. Any responsibilities of the State Department of Public Health to adopt regulations relating to building standards are hereby transferred to the commission, except that the commission shall not adopt any regulation without the concurrence of the State Department of Public Health. Nothing in this section shall be construed to change the current process for adopting regulations relating to building standards of health facilities, as defined in Section 1250.