California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2075 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/04/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2075ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Higher Education (Portantino (Chair), Block, Fong, Galgiani, Huber, Ma, and Ruskin) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 10764 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2075, Committee on Higher Education. Public contracts: California State University: bidding procedures. Existing law authorizes the trustees of the California State University to enter into contracts for public works projects, as provided. Existing law requires the trustees, for certain contracts estimated to exceed the value of a minor capital outlay project, to obtain financial information from prospective bidders by means of a standard form questionnaire and financial statement. Existing law prohibits the trustees from furnishing proposal forms to any person who is required to submit and has not submitted a questionnaire and financial statement for prequalification at least 5 days prior to the date fixed for publicly opening sealed bids and been prequalified for at least one day prior to that date. This bill would revise that requirement by changing the time in which a person has to submit the questionnaire and financial statement for prequalification to 10 business days prior to the date fixed for publicly opening sealed bids and require any person to have been prequalified for at least one business day prior to that date. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10764 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 10764. The trustees shall furnish to each bidder a standard proposal form, which, when filled out and executed, may be submitted as the bid. Bids not presented on forms so furnished shall be disregarded. The trustees shall not furnish proposal forms to any person who is required to submit and has not submitted a questionnaire and financial statement for prequalification at least 10 business days prior to the date fixed for publicly opening sealed bids and been prequalified for at least one business day prior to that date.