California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2098 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/24/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2098CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 250 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 30, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Miller, Jeffries, and Bonnie Lowenthal (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Garrick and John A. Perez) (Principal coauthors: Senators Correa, Dutton, Emmerson, Hollingsworth, and Huff) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Bradford, Buchanan, Charles Calderon, Carter, Conway, Cook, Coto, Davis, Fletcher, Fong, Fuller, Gaines, Galgiani, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Hill, Knight, Logue, Ma, Mendoza, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, Norby, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Silva, Smyth, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Torlakson, Torres, Tran, and Villines) (Coauthor: Senator Ducheny) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 6802 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2098, Miller. Riverside County Transportation Commission: transportation projects: contracts. Existing law, until January 1, 2014, allows certain state and local transportation entities, if authorized by the California Transportation Commission, to use a design-build process for contracting on transportation projects, as specified. This bill would authorize the Riverside County Transportation Commission, if authorized by the commission, to utilize this design-build procurement process for the State Route 91 Corridor Improvements Project on the state highway system. The bill would make the Department of Transportation responsible for the performance of construction inspection services for the project, as specified, and would require the commission to report on the progress of the project and related matters to specified legislative committees. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6802 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 6802. (a) Subject to the limitations of this chapter, a local transportation entity, if authorized by the commission, may utilize the design-build method of procurement for up to five projects that may be for local street or road, bridge, tunnel, or public transit projects within the jurisdiction of the entity. (b) Subject to the limitations of this chapter, the department, if authorized by the commission, may utilize the design-build method of procurement for up to 10 state highway, bridge, or tunnel projects. (c) (1) In addition to the projects authorized pursuant to subdivisions (a) and (b), and subject to the limitations of this chapter, the Riverside County Transportation Commission, if authorized by the commission, may utilize design-build procurement for the State Route 91 Corridor Improvements Project on the state highway system. (2) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, the department shall be the agency responsible for the performance of construction inspection services for the project authorized pursuant to this subdivision. Construction inspection services for the project authorized pursuant to this subdivision include, but are not limited to, surveying, testing the materials, verification testing, monitoring of environmental compliance, quality control inspection, and quality assurance audits. The construction inspection duties and responsibilities shall include a direct reporting relationship between the inspectors and senior department engineers responsible for all inspectors and construction inspection services. The senior department engineer responsible for construction inspection services shall be responsible for the acceptance or rejection of the work. (3) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, for the project authorized pursuant to this subdivision the department shall retain the authority to stop the contractor's operation wholly or in part and take appropriate action when public safety is jeopardized. The department shall ensure that public safety and convenience is maintained whenever work is performed under an encroachment permit within the state highway right-of-way, including, but not limited to, work performed that includes lane closures, signing, work performed at night, detours, dust control, temporary pavement quality, crash cushions, temporary railings, pavement transitions, falsework, shoring, and delineation. The department shall regularly inspect the job sites for safety compliance and any possible deficiencies. If any deficiency is observed, a written notice shall be sent to the resident engineer to correct the deficiency. Once the deficiency is corrected, a written notice describing the resolution of the deficiency shall be sent to the department and documented. (4) The department may use department employees or consultants to perform the services described in this subdivision, consistent with Article XXII of the California Constitution. Department resources necessary for the performance of those services, including personnel requirements, shall be included in the department's capital outlay support program for workload purposes in the annual Budget Act. (5) Not later than the first day of July that occurs two years after a design-build contract is awarded, and each July 1 thereafter until the project is completed, the Riverside County Transportation Commission shall submit a report on the progress of the project and compliance with this section to the legislative policy committees having jurisdiction over transportation matters. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to provide improved motorist safety, reduced traffic congestion, and increased traffic mobility on the state's highways at the earliest possible time, and the associated economic benefits, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.