California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2101 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2101ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to add Sections 18112 and 18604 to the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2101, Fong. Elections: prohibiting payments. (1) Existing law makes certain activities relating to voter registration a criminal offense. This bill would authorize a court, upon finding a person guilty of engaging in prohibited voter registration activities, to order, as a condition of probation, that the person be prohibited from receiving money or other consideration for assisting another person to register to vote. (2) Existing law makes certain activities relating to the circulation of an initiative, referendum, or recall petition a criminal offense. This bill would authorize a court, upon finding a person guilty of violating these provisions, to order, as a condition of probation, that the person be prohibited from receiving money or other consideration for gathering signatures on an initiative, referendum, or recall petition. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18112 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 18112. Upon conviction of a violation of any provision of this chapter, the court may order as a condition of probation that the convicted person be prohibited from receiving money or other valuable consideration for assisting another person to register to vote by receiving the completed affidavit of registration. SEC. 2. Section 18604 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 18604. Upon conviction of a violation of any provision of this article, Article 2 (commencing with Section 18610), Article 3 (commencing with Section 18620), Article 5 (commencing with Section 18640), Article 6 (commencing with Section 18650), or Article 7 (commencing with Section 18660), the court may order as a condition of probation that the convicted person be prohibited from receiving money or other valuable consideration for gathering signatures on an initiative, referendum, or recall petition.