BILL NUMBER: AB 2104ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hayashi FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 4003 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2104, Hayashi. California State Board of Pharmacy. Existing law, the Pharmacy Law, provides for the licensure and regulation of the practice of pharmacy by the California State Board of Pharmacy within the Department of Consumer Affairs. The department is under the control of the Director of Consumer Affairs. Existing law authorizes the board to appoint a person exempt from civil service designated as the executive officer who performs the duties delegated by the board. This bill would instead authorize the board to appoint the executive officer with the approval of the director. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4003 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4003. (a) The board, with the approval of the director, may appoint a person exempt from civil service who shall be designated as an executive officer and who shall exercise the powers and perform the duties delegated by the board and vested in him or her by this chapter. The executive officer may or may not be a member of the board as the board may determine. (b) The executive officer shall receive the compensation as established by the board with the approval of the Director of Finance. The executive officer shall also be entitled to travel and other expenses necessary in the performance of his or her duties. (c) The executive officer shall maintain and update in a timely fashion records containing the names, titles, qualifications, and places of business of all persons subject to this chapter. (d) The executive officer shall give receipts for all money received by him or her and pay it to the department, taking its receipt therefor. Besides the duties required by this chapter, the executive officer shall perform other duties pertaining to the office as may be required of him or her by the board. (e) In accordance with Sections 101.1 and 473.1, this section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2013, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2013, deletes or extends that date.