BILL NUMBER: AB 211ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 8, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Beall, Brownley, Buchanan, Carter, Eng, Garrick, Nestande, Solorio, Torlakson, and Audra Strickland) (Coauthor: Senator Romero) FEBRUARY 2, 2009 An act to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 17075.50) to Chapter 12.5 of Part 10 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 211, Mendoza. School facilities: classroom security locks. Existing law, the Leroy F. Greene School Facilities Act of 1998 (the Greene Act), requires the State Allocation Board to allocate to applicant school districts prescribed per-unhoused-pupil state funding for construction and modernization of school facilities, including hardship funding and supplemental funding for site development and acquisition. This bill, on and after July 1, 2011, would require all new construction projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to the Greene Act to include locks that allow doors to classrooms and rooms with an occupancy of 5 or more persons to be locked from the inside, except as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Violent incidents on school campuses are increasing at an alarming rate. Lockdowns are an effective tool that can be used on school campuses to facilitate the safety of pupils and staff during violent incidents. (b) The locks in most school classrooms, offices, and other rooms where pupils and staff gather can be locked only from the outside, and the safety of school staff and pupils could be placed in jeopardy if school staff is required to go out into a hallway to lock doors during a violent incident. (c) Locking mechanisms that lock a door from the inside, commonly referred to as classroom security locks, have been developed to quickly lock doors to classrooms, offices, and other rooms from the inside. SEC. 2. Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 17075.50) is added to Chapter 12.5 of Part 10 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, to read: Article 8.5. Classroom Security Locks 17075.50. (a) On and after July 1, 2011, all new construction projects submitted to the Division of the State Architect pursuant to this chapter shall include locks that allow doors to classrooms and any room with an occupancy of five or more persons to be locked from the inside. (b) The locks shall conform to the specifications and requirements set forth in Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations. (c) Doors that are locked from the outside at all times and pupil restrooms are exempt from the requirements of this section.