BILL NUMBER: AB 2128ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gaines FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 7583.40 of, and to repeal and add Section 7583.39 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to private security services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2128, Gaines. Private security services: insurance policies. The Private Security Services Act provides for the licensure and regulation of private patrol operators by the Bureau of Security and Investigative Services in the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law requires a private patrol operator employing a security guard who carries a firearm to maintain an insurance policy that provides minimum limits of insurance of $500,000 for any one loss due to bodily injury or death and $500,000 for any one loss due to injury or destruction of property. This bill would instead require all private patrol operators or applicants for licensure to file or have on file with the bureau an insurance policy that provides minimum limits of insurance of $1,000,000 for any one loss due to bodily injury or death and $1,000,000 for any one loss due to injury or destruction of property. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7583.39 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 7583.39 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 7583.39. The bureau shall require, as a condition precedent to the issuance, reinstatement, reactivation, renewal, or continued maintenance of a license, that the applicant or licensee file or have on file an insurance policy, as defined in Section 7583.40. SEC. 3. Section 7583.40 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 7583.40. "Insurance policy," as used in this article, means a contract of liability insurance issued by an insurance company authorized to transact business in this state that provides minimum limits of insurance of one million dollars ($1,000,000) for any one loss due to bodily injury or death and one million dollars ($1,000,000) for any one loss due to injury or destruction of property.