California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2154 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/10/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2154ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 3001 of, and to add Section 3007.8 to, the Elections Code, relating to vote by mail ballots. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2154, Solorio. Vote by mail ballots: telephone applications. Existing law requires that application for a vote by mail voter's ballot be made in writing to the elections official having jurisdiction over the election during a specified period prior to the election, except as specified. This bill would allow a local elections official to offer a voter the ability to apply for a vote by mail voter's ballot by telephone. The bill would require a telephone applicant for a vote by mail voter' s ballot to provide specified information to the elections official. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3001 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 3001. Except as provided in Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 3200) and Sections 3007.5, 3007.7, and 3007.8, application for a vote by mail voter's ballot shall be made in writing to the elections official having jurisdiction over the election between the 29th and the seventh day prior to the election. The application shall be signed by the applicant and shall show his or her place of residence. Any applications received by the elections official prior to the 29th day shall be kept and processed during the application period. SEC. 2. Section 3007.8 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 3007.8. (a) A local elections official may offer a voter the ability to apply for a vote by mail voter's ballot by telephone. (b) To apply by telephone, the applicant shall provide to the elections official personal identifying information that matches the information contained on the applicant's affidavit of registration, including first and last name, home address, and date of birth. The applicant's signature shall not be required. (c) Except as otherwise provided in this section, all provisions of this code governing written applications for vote by mail voter's ballots shall apply to applications made by telephone.