California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2178 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/19/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2178AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torlakson FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to  amend Section 8484 of, and to  add Section 8484.1 to  ,  the Education Code, relating to the After School Education and Safety Program. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2178, as amended, Torlakson. After School Education and Safety Program.  (1) Existing   Existing  law establishes the After School Education and Safety Program for the purpose of creating incentives for establishing locally driven before and after school enrichment programs both during schooldays and summer, intersession, or vacation days that partner public schools and communities to provide academic and literacy support and safe, constructive alternatives for youth. Existing law authorizes a program to operate a before school component, an after school component, or both the before and after school components, on one or multiple schoolsites. Existing law awards grants to qualified applicants. This bill, to the extent consistent with federal and state privacy laws, would authorize local educational agency grantees funded pursuant to the After School Education and Safety Program  and grants for 21st Century Community Learning Centers programs  to submit specified data to an operator of an after school program with which the local educational agency has a contract.  (2) Existing law, as required by the State Department of Education, requires programs established pursuant to the After School Education and Safety Program to submit annual outcome-based data for evaluation, as specified. Existing law requires the department to develop standardized tools and procedures to collect this data.   This bill would require the department to collect and maintain this data in a manner that enables the analysis of all programs and the aggregation of statewide reports, and that readily links to the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 8484 of the Education Code is amended to read: 8484. (a) As required by the department, programs established pursuant to this article shall submit annual outcome-based data for evaluation, including research-based indicators and measurable pupil outcomes for academic performance, attendance, and positive behavioral changes. The department may consider these outcomes when determining eligibility for grant renewal. (1) To demonstrate program effectiveness, grantees shall submit both of the following: (A) Schoolday attendance on an annual basis. (B) Program attendance. (2) To demonstrate program effectiveness based upon individual program focus, programs shall submit one or more of the following measures annually: (A) Positive behavioral changes, as reported by schoolday teachers or after school staff who directly supervise pupils. (B) Standardized Testing and Reporting (STAR) Program test scores. (C) Homework completion rates as reported by schoolday teachers or after school staff who directly supervise pupils. (D) Skill development as reported by schoolday teachers or after school staff who directly supervise pupils. (E) The department may develop additional measures for this paragraph. Any additions shall be developed in consultation with the evaluation committee of the advisory committee. (3) Programs shall submit information adopted through the process outlined in subdivision (c). (b) (1) If a program consistently fails to demonstrate measurable program outcomes for three consecutive years, the department may terminate the program as described in subdivision (a) of Section 8483.7. The department shall consider multiple outcomes and not rely on one outcome in isolation. (2) For purposes of this section, "consistently fails to demonstrate measurable program outcomes" means failure to meet program effectiveness requirements pursuant to the criteria in paragraphs (1) and (2) of subdivision (a). (3) Measurable program outcomes may be demonstrated by, but are not limited to, the following methods: (A) Comparing pupils participating in the program to nonparticipating pupils at the same schoolsite. (B) Pupils participating in the program demonstrate improvement on one or more indicators collected by the program pursuant to this paragraph. (4) For purposes of subparagraph (B) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (a), program effectiveness may be demonstrated using performance levels from the STAR Program by any of the following: (A) The grantee documents that the percentage of pupils performing at the far below basic level declined. (B) The grantee documents that the percentage of pupils performing above the far below basic and below basic levels increased. (C) The grantee documents that the percentage of pupils who performed at or above the basic level increased. (D) The grantee documents that pupils participating in the program performed better in a year-to-year comparison of the results of the STAR Program than their peers who were not participating in the program. (c) (1) The department shall develop standardized procedures and tools to collect the indicators in paragraphs (1) and (2) of subdivision (a). The department shall collect and maintain this data in a manner that enables the analysis of all programs and the aggregation of state reports, and that readily links to the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System. (2) The department shall consult with the evaluation committee of the Advisory Committee on Before and After School Programs pursuant to Section 8484.9 and the advisory board established pursuant to Section 60900.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 8484.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 8484.1. To the extent consistent with federal and state privacy laws, local educational agency grantees funded pursuant to this article  and Article 22.6 (commencing with Section 8484.7)  may submit the following pupil data to an operator of an after school program with which the local educational agency has a contract: (a) Schoolday attendance data. (b) Standardized Testing and Reporting (STAR) Program test scores, and scores on individual California Standards Tests. (c) High school exit examination scores. (d) English language development test placement or reclassification scores. (e) California Healthy Kids Survey  result data   results in aggregate form  .