California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2203 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2203AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Mendoza   )  FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to add Section 66406.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2203, as amended, Solorio. Public postsecondary education: college textbooks. Existing law establishes the 3 segments of public postsecondary education in this state. These segments include the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, and the California Community Colleges, which are administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. Existing law requires the trustees and the board of governors, and requests the regents, to work with the academic senates of each respective segment to encourage faculty to give consideration of the least costly practices in assigning textbooks, including using a selected textbook as long as it is educationally sound. This bill would  encourage   require  the board of governors  ,   and  the trustees, and  request  the regents  ,  to review each respective segment's student transfer policies, and to revise those policies, to ensure that students may continue to use a textbook selected for a transfer or general education course, regardless of publication date, for as long as the textbook is available to students and the information contained in the textbook is current and reflects contemporary thinking in the discipline. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66406.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66406.5. The Board of Governors of the California Community  Colleges,   Colleges and  the Trustees of the California State University  shall  , and the Regents of the University of California are  encouraged to   requested to,  review each respective segment's student transfer policies, and to revise those policies, to ensure that students may continue to use a textbook selected for a transfer or general education course, regardless of publication date, for as long as the textbook is available to students and the information contained in the textbook is current and reflects contemporary thinking in the discipline.