California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB228 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/20/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 228AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huffman FEBRUARY 4, 2009 An act to amend Sections 25402.5 and 25402.5.4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 228, as amended, Huffman. Energy: outdoor lighting efficiency. Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to adopt regulations on minimum energy efficiency standards for lighting that would reduce the average statewide electrical energy consumption by not less than 25% from the 2007 levels for outdoor lighting by 2018. Existing law requires the commission to consult with the Department of Transportation to ensure that outdoor lighting standards that affect the department are compatible with the department's policies and standards for safety and illumination levels on state highways. This bill would require the commission, by  an unspecified time   December 31, 2011  , to adopt minimum energy efficiency standards that would achieve the above reduction for outdoor lighting as soon as practicable  , but no later than January 1, 2018  . The bill would also eliminate the requirement that the commission consult with the department. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25402.5 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25402.5. (a) As used in this section, "lighting device" includes, but is not limited to, a lamp, luminaire, light fixture, lighting control, ballast, or any component of those devices. (b) (1) The commission shall consider both new and replacement, and both interior and exterior, lighting devices as lighting which is subject to subdivision (a) of Section 25402. (2) The commission shall include both indoor and outdoor lighting devices as appliances to be considered in prescribing standards pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (c) of Section 25402. (3) The Legislature hereby finds and declares that paragraphs (1) and (2) are declarative of existing law. (c) The commission shall adopt efficiency standards for outdoor lighting. The standards shall be technologically feasible and cost-effective. As used in this subdivision, "outdoor lighting" refers to all electrical lighting that is not subject to standards adopted pursuant to Section 25402, and includes, but is not limited to, street lights, traffic lights, parking lot lighting, and billboard lighting. SEC. 2. Section 25402.5.4 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25402.5.4. (a) On or before December 31, 2008, the commission shall adopt minimum energy efficiency standards for all general purpose lights on a schedule specified in the regulations. The regulations, in combination with other programs and activities affecting lighting use in the state, shall be structured to reduce average statewide electrical energy consumption by not less than 50 percent from the 2007 levels for indoor residential lighting and by not less than 25 percent from the 2007 levels for indoor commercial and outdoor lighting, by 2018. (b) The commission shall make recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature regarding how to continue reductions in electrical consumption for lighting beyond 2018. (c) The commission may establish programs to encourage the sale in this state of general purpose lights that meet or exceed the standards set forth in subdivision (a). (d) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), the Department of General Services, and all other state agencies, as defined in Section 12200 of the Public Contract Code, in coordination with the commission, shall cease purchasing general purpose lights that do not meet the standards adopted pursuant to subdivision (a), within two years of those standards being adopted. (2) The Department of General Services, and all other state agencies, as defined in Section 12200 of the Public Contract Code, in coordination with the commission shall cease purchasing general purpose lights with an appearance that is historically appropriate for the facilities in which the lights are being used, and that do not meet the standards adopted pursuant to subdivision (a) within four years of those standards being adopted. (e) It is the intent of the Legislature to encourage the Regents of the University of California, in coordination with the commission, to cease purchasing general purpose lights that do not meet the standards adopted pursuant to subdivision (a), within two years of those standards being adopted. (f) (1) (A) For purposes of this section, "general purpose lights" means lamps, bulbs, tubes, or other electric devices that provide functional illumination for indoor residential, indoor commercial, and outdoor use. (B) General purpose lights do not include any of the following types of specialty lighting: appliance, black light, bug, colored, infrared, left-hand thread, marine, marine signal service, mine service, plant light, reflector, rough service, shatter resistant, sign service, silver bowl, showcase, three-way, traffic signal, and vibration service or vibration resistant. (2) The commission may, after one or more public workshops, with public notice and an opportunity for all interested parties to comment, provide for inclusion of a particular type of specialty light in its energy efficiency standards applicable to general purpose lighting, if it finds that there has been a significant increase in sales of that particular type of particular specialty light due to the use of that specialty light in general purpose lighting applications. (3) General purpose lights do not include lights needed to provide special-needs lighting for individuals with exceptional needs. (g) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), no later than  January 1, 20__,   December 31, 2011,  the commission shall adopt minimum energy efficiency standards applicable to outdoor lighting to achieve a 25 percent reduction in consumption as specified in subdivision (a) as soon as practicable  , but no later than January 1, 2018  . When adopting efficiency standards for outdoor lighting, the commission shall have the authority to include efficiency standards for outdoor lighting systems. (2) The Legislature finds and declares that new and emerging lighting efficiency technologies, including technologies applicable to lighting systems, provide enormous opportunities to accelerate the conservation efforts mandated by this section. It is the intent of the Legislature to achieve the energy efficiencies required by this section significantly earlier than 2018.