California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2300 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/03/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2300AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Emmerson FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to add Section 124982 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to genetic counselors. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2300, as amended, Emmerson. Genetic counselors. Existing law, the Hereditary Disorders Act, requires the State Department of Public Health to establish hereditary disorder programs, 100 specified, and to license master level genetic counselors and doctoral level geneticists. One of the requirements for licensure is that an individual demonstrate competence by a examination administered or approved by the department. Existing law prohibits an unlicensed person from using the title of genetic counselor. This bill would require, on and after July 1, 2011, the department to issue a temporary genetic counselor license, valid for one year, to a person who meets all of the requirements for licensure except passing the above-described examination. The bill would require a person working under a temporary genetic counselor license to work under the general supervision of a licensed genetic counselor or a licensed physician and surgeon. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 124982 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 124982. (a) On and after July 1, 2011, the department shall issue a temporary genetic counselor license valid for one year to a person to practice  genetic counseling   as a licensed genetic counselor  who meets all the requirements for licensure set forth in Section 124981, except passing the certification examination as required by Section 124981. (b) A person holding a temporary genetic counselor license who fails the first available certification examination held by the ABGC may reapply, no later than 30 days after the date of the examination, on a one-time basis, for an additional temporary genetic counselor license. (c) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), a temporary license issued pursuant to this section shall expire upon any of the following events, whichever occurs earlier: (1) The issuance of a license pursuant to Section 124981. (2) Thirty days after notification of the department that an applicant has failed the certification examination, or on the date that the applicant applies and is granted an additional temporary license pursuant to subdivision (b). (3) The expiration date on the temporary license. (d) A person holding a temporary genetic counselor license issued pursuant to this section, shall be required to work under the general supervision of a licensed genetic counselor or a licensed physician and surgeon.