California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2336 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/17/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2336AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuller (Coauthor: Assembly Member Gilmore) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 85308.5 to the Water Code, relating to the Delta. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2336, as amended, Fuller. Delta Stewardship Council. The Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta Reform Act of 2009 establishes the Delta Stewardship Council as an independent agency of the state. The act requires the council, on or before January 1, 2012, to develop, adopt, and commence implementation of a comprehensive management plan for the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta (Delta Plan), meeting specified requirements. The act establishes the Delta Independent Science Board to provide oversight of the scientific research, monitoring, and assessment programs that support adaptive management of the Delta through periodic reviews. This bill would require the council, in the course of developing and adopting the Delta Plan, to direct the board to conduct an assessment of certain stressors on populations of native fish species in the Delta, the Sacramento and San Joaquin rivers, and the tributaries to those rivers below the rim dams of the central valley, and recommend changes in statute and actions by state agencies to remedy the situation in as timely a manner as possible. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. In order to protect and preserve the existing populations of native fish species that live and migrate through the San Francisco Bay and the Sacramento-San Joaquin River Delta, it is the intent of the Legislature that the Delta Stewardship Council consider for inclusion in its final Delta Plan, in addition to measures addressing the impacts of the State Water Resources Development System (State Water Project) and federal Central Valley Project operations, the identification of effective and scientifically justified measures to reduce or eliminate the impact of other significant stressors on California's native fish populations. SEC. 2. Section 85308.5 is added to the Water Code, to read: 85308.5. The council, in the course of developing and adopting the Delta Plan, shall direct the Delta Independent Science Board to conduct an assessment of stressors,  other than   in addition to  the operations of the State Water Resources Development System and the federal Central Valley Project, on populations of native fish species in the Delta, the Sacramento and San Joaquin rivers, and the tributaries to those rivers below the rim dams of the central valley, and recommend changes in statute and actions by state agencies to remedy the situation in as timely a manner as possible. The assessment shall include, but is not necessarily limited to, those stressors identified in the Delta Vision Strategic Plan, including the impacts of invasive species and nonnative species, water quality impairments, and predation on native species.