California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2352 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/10/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2352ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member John A. Perez FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 14132.70 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2352, John A. Perez. Medi-Cal: organ transplants: antirejection medication. Existing law establishes the Medi-Cal program, administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which basic health care services are provided to qualified low-income persons. Under existing law, organ transplants and donor surgeries are covered as reimbursable services under the Medi-Cal program. This bill would provide that a Medi-Cal beneficiary shall remain eligible to receive Medi-Cal coverage for antirejection medication for up to 2 years following an organ transplant, unless during that period the beneficiary becomes eligible for Medicare or private health insurance that would cover the medication. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14132.70 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 14132.70. (a) A Medi-Cal beneficiary shall remain eligible to receive Medi-Cal coverage for antirejection medication for up to two years following an organ transplant, unless during that period the beneficiary becomes eligible for Medicare or private health insurance that would cover the medication. (b) Notwithstanding Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, the department may implement, interpret, or make specific this section by means of all-county letters, provider bulletins, or similar instructions, without taking any further regulatory action.