BILL NUMBER: AB 2362AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 18, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Skinner and Blakeslee FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 33420.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2362, as amended, Skinner. Redevelopment funds: soft-story building seismic retrofits. The Community Redevelopment Law authorizes the establishment of redevelopment agencies in communities in order to address the effects of blight, as defined, in those communities and requires those agencies to prepare, or cause to be prepared, and to approve a redevelopment plan for each project area. That law authorizes the agencies, within a project area and for any project undertaken for building rehabilitation or alternation in construction, to take those actions deemed necessary and that are consistent with existing law to provide for seismic retrofits, as specified. This bill would specifically include soft-story buildings, as defined, as a type of building eligible for seismic retrofits provided by an agency. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33420.1 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 33420.1. Within a project area, for any project undertaken by an agency for building rehabilitation or alteration in construction, an agency may take those actions which the agency determines necessary and which is consistent with local, state, and federal law, to provide for seismic retrofits as follows: (a) For unreinforced masonry buildings, to meet therequirements of Chapter 1 of the Appendix of the Uniform Code for Building Conservation of the International Conference of Building Officials.requirements of Appendix Chapter A1 of the California Existing Building Code (Part 10 of Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations). (b) For any buildings that qualify as "historical property" under Section 37602, to meet the requirements of the State Historical Building Code (Part 2.7 (commencing with Section 18950) of Division 13). (c) For buildings other than unreinforced masonry buildings and historical properties, including, but not limited to, soft-story buildings, to meet the requirements of the most current edition ofthe Uniform Building Code of the International Conference of Building Officialsthe California Building Code (Part 2 of Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations) . For purposes of this section, a "soft-story building" means a wood frame, multiunit residential building constructed before January 1, 1978, where the ground floor of the portion of the structure contains parking or other similar open floor space that causes soft, weak, or open-front wall lines. If an agency undertakes seismic retrofits and proposes to add new territory to the project area, to increase either the limitation on the number of dollars to be allocated to the redevelopment agency or the time limit on the establishing of loans, advances, and indebtedness established pursuant to paragraphs (1) and (2) of Section 33333.2, to lengthen the period during which the redevelopment plan is effective, to merge project areas, or to add significant additional capital improvement projects, as determined by the agency, the agency shall amend its redevelopment plan and follow the same procedure, and the legislative body is subject to the same restrictions, as provided for in Article 4 (commencing with Section 33330) for the adoption of a plan.