California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2371 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/06/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2371ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 5, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Anderson FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 12172.8 to the Government Code, relating to the Secretary of State. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2371, Anderson. Secretary of State: voter registration fraud. Existing law makes the Secretary of State the chief elections officer of the state and requires the Secretary of State to see that state election laws are enforced. Under existing law, if the Secretary of State concludes that the state election laws are not being enforced, the Secretary of State must call the violation to the attention of the district attorney or the Attorney General. This bill would require the Secretary of State to acknowledge the receipt of a complaint within a specified amount of time when a person makes a written complaint alleging a violation of the Elections Code to the Secretary of State. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12172.8 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12172.8. If a person makes a written complaint alleging that an Elections Code violation has occurred within his or her county to the Secretary of State, the Secretary of State shall acknowledge in writing receipt of the complaint to the person who made the complaint, within 21 days of its receipt.