California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2386 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/11/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2386AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Gilmore and Cook FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add  and repeal  Section 714  to   of  the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Armed Forces. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2386, as amended, Gilmore. Armed Forces: medical personnel. Existing federal law authorizes a health care professional, as defined, to practice his or her health profession in any state or territory without licensure by that state if he or she has a current license to practice the health profession and is performing authorized duties for the Department of Defense. Existing state law provides that no board that licenses dentists, physicians and surgeons, podiatrists, or nurses may require a person to obtain a California license to practice his or her profession in this state if the person is employed by, or has a contract with, the federal government and is rendering services in a facility of the government or the person is practicing as part of a program or project conducted by the federal government which, by federal statute, exempts persons in the program from state licensure, as specified. This bill  ,   until January 1, 2016,  would authorize a hospital to enter into an agreement with the Armed Forces of the United States to authorize a physician and surgeon, physician assistant, or registered nurse to provide medical care in the hospital if the health care professional holds a valid license in good standing in another state or territory, the medical care is provided as part of a training or educational program designed to  further   promote  the  employment   combat readiness  of the health care professional, and the agreement complies with federal law. The bill would exempt those health care professionals from licensure or relicensure by the State of California  while practicing under an agreement  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 714 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 714. (a) A hospital may enter into an agreement with the Armed Forces of the United States to authorize a physician and surgeon, physician assistant, or registered nurse to provide medical care in the hospital if all of the following apply: (1) The physician and surgeon, physician assistant, or registered nurse holds a valid license in good standing to provide medical care in the District of Columbia or any state or territory of the United States. (2) The medical care is provided as part of a training or educational program designed to  further the employment   promote the combat readiness  of the physician and surgeon, physician assistant, or registered nurse. (3) The agreement complies with Section 1094 of Title 10 of the United States Code and any regulations or guidelines adopted pursuant to that section. (b) If an agreement is entered into pursuant to subdivision (a), no board under this division that licenses physicians and surgeons, physician assistants, or registered nurses may require a person under subdivision (a) to obtain or maintain any license to practice his or her profession or render services in the State of California.  (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.