California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB24 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/01/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 24AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 26, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Salas) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ma and Saldana) DECEMBER 1, 2008 An act to  add Section 89013 to   amend Section 89320 of, and to add Section 89013 to,  the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 24, as amended, Block. California State University: feasibility study: Chula Vista.  Existing   (1)     Existing  law establishes the various segments of the public higher education system in the state. These segments include the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. This bill would require the Chancellor of the California State University, within 18 months of  a certification by the trustees that funds are available   the effective date of this bill  , to complete and submit to the trustees a study about the feasibility of a California State University satellite program, and ultimately, an independent California State University campus, at Chula Vista.  (2) Existing law requires the Trustees of the California State University to require each state university to permit a student to take a test at a time when it would not violate the student's religious creed. Existing law provides that this requirement does not apply if providing an alternative time to take the test would create an undue hardship.   This bill would remove this undue hardship exception.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89013 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89013. (a) The Chancellor of the California State University shall conduct a study about the feasibility of a California State University satellite program, and ultimately, an independent California State University campus, at Chula Vista. The study shall include all of the following: (1) Ten-year enrollment projections and physical capacity analysis. (2) Regional workforce needs. (3) Prospective economic impact and job creation in the region. (4) Infrastructure availability. (5) The potential alleviation of overcrowding and traffic at the San Diego State University campus. (6) Considerations of plausible alternatives. (7) Academic planning and program justification. (8) A description of proposed student services and student outreach programs. (9) Support and capital outlay budget projections. (10) Geographic and physical accessibility. (11) Environmental and social impacts. (12) Effects on other educational institutions.  (b) Funding for the study required by subdivision (a) shall be derived solely from private sources.   (c)   (b)  The chancellor shall complete and submit the study to the trustees within 18 months  after the date that the trustees certify that sufficient funds are available to conduct the study   from the effective date of this section  .  SEC. 2.   Section 89320 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  89320. The Trustees of the California State University shall require each state university, in administering any test or examination, to permit any student who is eligible to undergo the test or examination to do so, without penalty, at a time when that activity would not violate the  student's   student's  religious creed.  This requirement shall not apply in the event that administering the test or examination at an alternate time would impose an undue hardship which could not reasonably have been avoided. In any court proceeding in which the existence of an undue hardship which could not reasonably have been avoided is an issue, the burden of proof shall be upon the institution.