BILL NUMBER: AB 2421INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nielsen FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 12670.14 of the Water Code, relating to water resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2421, as introduced, Nielsen. Water development projects: Sacramento-San Joaquin watersheds. Existing law adopts and authorizes specified projects in areas within the City of Sacramento and the Counties of Sacramento and Sutter at an estimated cost to the state of the sum that may be appropriated by the Legislature for state participation upon the recommendation and advice of the Department of Water Resources or the Reclamation Board. This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12670.14 of the Water Code is amended to read: 12670.14. The following projects in areas within the City of Sacramento and rural areas of the Counties of Sacramento and Sutter are adopted and authorized at an estimated cost to the state of the sum that may be appropriated by the Legislature for state participation upon the recommendation and advice of the department or the Reclamation Board: (a) The project for flood control in the Natomas and North Sacramento areas adopted and authorized by Congress in Section 9159 of the Department of Defense Appropriations Act of 1993 (Public Law 102-396) substantially in accordance with the recommendations of the Chief of Engineers in the report entitled "American River Watershed Investigation" dated July 1, 1992. (b) The project for flood control along the American and Sacramento Rivers adopted and authorized by Congress in Section 101 (a)(1) of the Water Resources Development Act of 1996 (Public Law 104-303) substantially in accordance with the recommendations of the Chief of Engineers in the report entitled "American River Watershed Project, California" dated June 27, 1996, as modified by Congress in Section 366 of the Water Resources Development Act of 1999 (Public Law 106-53 ) , and as further modified to include the project features necessary to provide a 200-year level of flood protection along the American and Sacramento Rivers and within the Natomas Basin as described in the final engineer's report dated April 19, 2007, adopted by the Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency. (c) The project to modify Folsom Dam adopted and authorized by Congress in Section 101(a)(6) of the Water Resources Development Act of 1999 (Public Law 106-53) , as described in the United States Army Corps of Engineers Supplemental Information Report for the American River Watershed Project, California, dated March 1996, as modified by the report entitled "Folsom Dam Modification Report, New Outlets Plan," dated March 1998, prepared by the Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency, and as further modified by the Post-Authorization Change Report, American River Watershed Project (Folsom Dam Modification and Folsom Dam Raise Projects), dated March 2007, adopted by Congress in Section 3023 of the Water Resources Development Act of 2007 (Public Law 110-114) . (d) (1) The project for flood control, environmental restoration, and recreation along south Sacramento County streams adopted and authorized by Congress in Section 101(a)(7) of the Water Resources Development Act of 1999 (Public Law 106-53) as described in the report of the Chief of Engineers entitled "South Sacramento County Streams, California" dated October 6, 1998. (2) Notwithstanding Section 12657, at the discretion of the Reclamation Board, the Sacramento Area Flood Control Agency may provide, for the project described in paragraph (1), the assurances of local cooperation satisfactory to the Secretary of the Army, in accordance with Section 12657, in lieu of assurances by the Reclamation Board.