California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2440 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2440INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Tom Berryhill FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 127664 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2440, as introduced, Tom Berryhill. Public health: health care benefits. Existing law requests the University of California to establish the California Health Benefit Review Program to assess legislation proposing to mandate a benefit or service, as defined, and legislation proposing to repeal a mandated service or benefit, as defined, that, if enacted, becomes effective on or after January 1, 2008, and to prepare a written analysis in accordance with specified criteria. Existing law also requests the University of California to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by January 1, 2010, regarding the implementation of the program. This bill would additionally request the University of California to submit to the Governor and the Legislature by July 1, 2011, an evaluation of the accuracy of the medical, public health, and cost projections and estimates found in the reports it has issued pursuant to the program prior to December 31, 2009. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 127664 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 127664.  (a)    The Legislature requests the University of California to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by January 1, 2014, regarding the implementation of this chapter.  (b) The Legislature requests the University of California to submit to the Governor and the Legislature by July 1, 2011, an evaluation of the medical, public health, and cost projections and estimates found in the reports it has issued pursuant to this chapter prior to December 31, 2009.