BILL NUMBER: AB 245ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 25, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ma FEBRUARY 10, 2009 An act to add Section 2027.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to physicians and surgeons. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 245, Ma. Physicians and surgeons. Existing law, the Medical Practice Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of physicians and surgeons by the Medical Board of California. Existing law requires the board to post certain information on the Internet regarding licensed physicians and surgeons, including, but not limited to, felony convictions, certain misdemeanor convictions, and whether or not the licensees are in good standing. Existing law requires that certain information remain posted for 10 years and prohibits the removal of certain other information. This bill would require the board to remove expunged misdemeanor or felony convictions posted pursuant to those provisions within 90 days of receiving a copy of the expungement order from the licensee. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2027.1 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 2027.1. Notwithstanding subdivision (b) of Section 2027, the board shall remove an expunged misdemeanor or felony conviction posted pursuant to Section 2027 within 90 days of receiving a copy of the expungement order from the licensee.