California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2618 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/06/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2618CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 44 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 6, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 6, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 17, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 27297.7 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2618, Nestande. Local government: county recorder. Existing law authorizes the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors and the Riverside County Board of Supervisors to adopt a resolution to authorize the county recorder to notify the party or parties executing a deed, quitclaim deed, or deed of trust. This bill would extend this authorization to the board of supervisors of every county in the state. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27297.7 of the Government Code is amended to read: 27297.7. (a) Following adoption of an authorizing resolution by the board of supervisors, the county recorder may, within 30 days of recordation of a deed, quitclaim deed, or deed of trust, notify by mail the party or parties executing the document. The recorder may require, as a condition of recording, that a deed, quitclaim deed, or deed of trust indicate the assessor's identification number or numbers that fully contain all, or a portion of, the real property described in the legal description. If the description contains more than one assessor's parcel, all assessor's parcels shall be indicated. The form of the entry shall be substantially as follows: Assessor's Identification Number __-__-__. (b) This section shall not apply to the recordation of any document where the federal government, or state, county, city, or any subdivision of the state acquires title. (c) The failure of the county recorder to provide the notice as permitted by this section shall not result in any liability against the recorder or the county. In the event that the notice is returned to the recorder by the postal service as undeliverable, the recorder is not required to retain the returned notice. (d) Where the county recorder contracts with any party or parties for the performance of the processing or the mailing of the notice, or both, as authorized by this section, the contract shall be awarded by competitive bid. The county recorder shall solicit written bids for the contract in a newspaper of general circulation in the county, and all bids received shall be publicly opened and the contract awarded to the lowest responsible bidder. If the county recorder or his or her designee deems the acceptance of the lowest responsible bid is not in the best interest of the county, all bids may be rejected.