BILL NUMBER: AB 2645INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chesbro FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 5912 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2645, as introduced, Chesbro. Mental health: skilled nursing facilities: reimbursement rate. Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of health facilities, including skilled nursing facilities, by the State Department of Public Health. Existing law requires the State Department of Health Care Services to contract with skilled nursing facilities that have been designated by the State Department of Mental Health as institutions for mental disease to provide services to the residents. Under existing law, as log as contracts require institutions for mental disease to continue to be licensed as skilled nursing facilities, they shall be reimbursed at a specified rate, subject to an annual increase of 4.7 percent. This bill would, on and after July 1, 2010, set the reimbursement rate for services in institutions for mental disease at the same rate as was in effect on July 1, 2009. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5912 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 5912. (a) As long as contracts require institutions for mental disease to continue to be licensed and certified as skilled nursing facilities by the State Department of Public HealthServices, they shall be reimbursed for basic services at the rate established by the State Department of Health Care Services. Except as provided in this section, reimbursement rates for services in institutions for mentaldiseasesdisease shall be the same as the rates in effect on July 31, 2004. Effective July 1, 2005, through June 30, 2008, the reimbursement rate for institutions for mental disease shall increase by 6.5 percent annually. Effective July 1, 2008, the reimbursement rate for institutions for mental disease shall increase by 4.7 percent annually. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), on and after July 1, 2010, the reimbursement rate for services in institutions for mental disease shall be the same as the rates in effect on July 1, 2009.