California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB265 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 265CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 93 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 29, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cook FEBRUARY 11, 2009 An act to amend Section 3003 of the Government Code, relating to forfeiture of office. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 265, Cook. Office holding: forfeiture. Existing law requires certain elected local officers to forfeit their office upon the conviction of a specified crime pursuant to the federal Stolen Valor Act of 2005. This bill would expand this provision to include elected state officers. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3003 of the Government Code is amended to read: 3003. An elected officer of the state or a city, county, city and county, or district in this state forfeits his or her office upon the conviction of a crime pursuant to the federal Stolen Valor Act of 2005 (18 U.S.C. Sec. 704), that involves a false claim of receipt of any military decoration or medal described in that act. As used in this section, "district" means any agency of the state formed pursuant to general law or special act, for the local performance of governmental or proprietary functions within limited boundaries.